EP0983293 - FADD-LIKE ANTI-APOPTOTIC MOLECULES, METHODS OF USING THE SAME, AND COMPOSITIONS FOR AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY 1020 Walnut Avenue Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19107 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY 11th and Walnut Streets Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALNEMRI, Emad, S. 805 Meetinghouse Road Ambler, PA 19002 / US | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Hallybone, Huw George CARPMAELS AND RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98924795.2 | 20.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998US10200 | Priority number, date | US19970859167 | 20.05.1997 Original published format: US 859167 | [2000/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852963 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983293 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.11.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/04, G01N33/48, G01N33/53, G01N33/574, C12P21/06, C07K16/00 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/4747 (EP,US);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | FADD-ÄHNLICHE ANTI-APOPTOTISCHE MOLEKÜLE, METHODEN ZU IHRER ANWENDUNG UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2000/10] | English: | FADD-LIKE ANTI-APOPTOTIC MOLECULES, METHODS OF USING THE SAME, AND COMPOSITIONS FOR AND METHODS OF MAKING THE SAME | [2000/10] | French: | MOLECULES ANTI-APOPTOSE DE TYPE FADD, PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CES MOLECULES, COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION DE CES COMPOSITIONS | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1999 | Search fee paid | 18.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 07.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/49] | 25.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX] - SRINIVASULA S M ET AL, "FLAME-1, A NOVEL FADD-LIKE ANTI-APOPTOTIC MOLECULE THAT REGULATES FAS/TNFR1-INDUCED APOPTOSIS", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19970725), vol. 272, no. 30, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 18542 - 18545, XP002071905 [PX] 1-7,12-15,19,20,22,23,25 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.30.18542 | [ ] - SRINIVASULA S M ET AL, "Homo sapiens FLAME-1 mRNA, complete cds.", EMBL, (19970929), Database accession no. AF009616; O15519, XP002204029 | [DA] - BERTIN J ET AL, "Death effector domain-containing herpesvirus and poxvirus proteins inhibit both Fas- and TNFR1-induced apoptosis", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (19970201), vol. 94, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1172 - 1176, XP002089676 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.94.4.1172 | [A] - AHMAD M ET AL, "GRADD, A NOVEL HUMAN APOPTOTIC ADAPTOR MOLECULE FOR CASPASE-2, AND FASL/TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR RECEPTOR-INTERACTING PROTEIN RIP", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19970215), vol. 57, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 615 - 619, XP002072215 | International search | [XP] - SRINIVASCULA S. M., ET AL., "FLAME-1, A NOVEL FADD-LIKE ANTI-APOPTOTIC MOLECULE THAT REGULATES FAS/TNFR1-INDUCED APOPTOSIS.", Journal of Biological Chemistry, American Society for Biochemistry and Molecular Biology, US, US, (19970701), vol. 272., no. 30., doi:10.1074/jbc.272.30.18542, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 18542 - 18545., XP002911897 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.30.18542 |