EP1011752 - CELL PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/26] | CELL PROCESSING SYSTEMS | ||
[2004/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zymequest, Inc. 100 Cummings Center, Suite 436 H Beverly, MA 01915-6122 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Zymequest, Inc. 100 Cummings Center, Suite 436 H Beverly, MA 01915-6122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORGENSEN, Glen 38 Beverly Drive Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | 02 /
BARRY, Donald 379 Railroad Avenue Norwood, MA 02062 / US | 03 /
EDWARDS, Bruce, H. 156 Robert Road Marlboro, MA 01752 / US | 04 /
FENNELLY, Jeremy 97 Homer Avenue Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 05 /
O'BRIEN, John, P. 74 Elmira Street 2 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | 06 /
SACCO, Victor, Jr. 376 Ocean Avenue 206 Revere, MA 02151 / US | 07 /
MARTIN, Roy, E., III 46 Dover Street Worcester, MA 01609 / US | 08 /
SUSSER, Mark 208 Highland Street Weston, MA 02193 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Potter, Julian Mark, et al Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street, London EC2V 7JX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/14] | Potter, Julian Mark, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP, The Rectory, 9 Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2004/50] | Crump, Julian Richard John, et al Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP The Rectory 9, Ironmonger Lane London EC2V 8EY / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98924826.5 | 20.05.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US10406 | Priority number, date | US19970047213P | 20.05.1997 Original published format: US 47213 P | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9852629 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1011752 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1011752 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/36, C12M3/00 | [2004/05] | CPC: |
B04B7/08 (EP,US);
A61M1/0222 (EP,US);
A61M1/3692 (EP,US);
A61M1/3693 (EP,US);
A61M1/3695 (EP,US);
A61M1/3696 (EP,US);
A61M1/3698 (EP,US);
B04B5/0428 (EP,US);
B04B5/0442 (EP,US);
A61M1/3687 (EP,US);
A61M2202/0429 (EP,US);
A61M2205/128 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3393 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00217 (EP,US);
Y10S277/907 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87249 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61M2202/0429, A61M2202/0064 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | A61M1/36 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN ZELLEN | [2000/26] | English: | CELL PROCESSING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING IT | [2004/05] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE CELLULES BIOLOGIQUES | [2000/26] |
Former [2000/26] | CELL PROCESSING SYSTEMS | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 18.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04104991.7 / EP1514564 | EP09180352.8 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 23.01.2010 | EP99123932.8 / EP0987036 | EP99123933.6 / EP0987037 | EP99123934.4 / EP0987038 | EP99123935.1 / EP0987039 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | SE | 13.01.2005 | GB | 20.05.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/17] | BE | 13.10.2004 | |
SE | 13.01.2005 | ||
GB | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | BE | 13.10.2004 | |
GB | 20.05.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | BE | 13.10.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4300717 (LATHAM JR ALLEN); | [X]EP0682953 (HAEMONETICS CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-7,11,12,15 * page 3, line 18 - line 43 * * page 4, line 20 - line 31 * * page 5, line 6 - line 43 * * page 6, line 7 - line 13 * * page 6, line 51 - line 53 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO9628199 (ENTREMED INC [US]) [X] 1,3,7,9,10,12,15 * page 25, line 27 - page 28, line 7 * * page 31, line 7 - line 11 * * page 33, line 1 * * figure 1 * |