EP0986385 - ANTAGONISTS OF GONADOTROPIN RELEASING HORMONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOULET, Mark 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 02 /
UJJAINWALLA, Feroze 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 03 /
WALSH, Thomas, F. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | 04 /
WYVRATT, Matthew, J., Jr. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road, Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2000/12] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc., Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 98925129.3 | 01.06.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998US11207 | Priority number, date | US19970048739P | 05.06.1997 Original published format: US 48739 P | US19970048634P | 05.06.1997 Original published format: US 48634 P | GB19970019841 | 18.09.1997 Original published format: GB 9719841 | GB19980000450 | 09.01.1998 Original published format: GB 9800450 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855116 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986385 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/40, A61K31/44, C07D213/73, C07D407/06, A61P5/02, A61P5/24, A61P15/00, A61P15/12, A61P25/00, A61P43/00 | [2001/19] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/12] | A61K31/40, A61K31/44, C07D213/73, C07D407/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Title | German: | ANTAGONISTEN DES GONADORELINS | [2000/12] | English: | ANTAGONISTS OF GONADOTROPIN RELEASING HORMONE | [2000/12] | French: | ANTAGONISTES DE GONADOLIBERINE | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 05.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 02.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]WO9721435 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PA] 3-20 * abstract * * claims 1-38 *; | [PA]WO9721704 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PA] 3-20 * abstract * * claims 1-23 *; | [PA]WO9721707 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PA] 3-20 * abstract * * claims 1-25 * | International search | [Y]US4252803 (WEBB COLIN F); | [Y]US5245046 (YOUNGDALE GILBERT A [US], et al) |