EP0996855 - IMPROVED BIOSENSOR INVOLVING THE USE OF OPTICALLY SENSITIVE MOIETIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ambri Limited 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | [2002/41] |
Former [2002/37] | For all designated states AUSTRALIAN MEMBRANE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | ||
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states AUSTRALIAN MEMBRANE AND BIOTECHNOLOGY RESEARCH INSTITUTE 126 Greville Street Chatswood, NSW 2067 / AU | ||
For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF SYDNEY Parramatta Road Sydney, New South Wales 2006 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSMAN, Peter, Damien, John 20 Carramar Road West Lindfield, NSW 2070 / AU | 02 /
BURNS, Christopher, John 9 North Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 03 /
MARTIN, Alistair, Scott 7/59 Crown Road Queenscliff, NSW 2096 / AU | 04 /
KING, Lionel, George 167 Murray Farm Road Beecroft, NSW 2119 / AU | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98925325.7 | 04.06.1998 | [2000/18] | WO1998AU00424 | Priority number, date | AU1997PO07170 | 04.06.1997 Original published format: AU PO717097 | AU1997PO00449 | 20.11.1997 Original published format: AU PO044997 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855855 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996855 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/327, G01N27/333, C07C245/08, G01N33/543 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
C07K14/36 (EP,US);
G01N33/5438 (EP,US);
Y10S436/806 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/18] | G01N27/327, G01N27/333, C07C245/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | BIOSENSOR UNTER VERWENDUNG VON OPTISCH EMPFINDLICHEN TEILEN | [2000/18] | English: | IMPROVED BIOSENSOR INVOLVING THE USE OF OPTICALLY SENSITIVE MOIETIES | [2000/18] | French: | BIOCAPTEUR PERFECTIONNE IMPLIQUANT L'UTILISATION DE PARTIES A SENSIBILITE OPTIQUE | [2000/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 24.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 24.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 19.08.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/30] | 10.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/exclusive | For: | all designated states | Licencee: | Biosensor Entreprises, LLC 925 Page Mill Road, Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Date: | 25.08.2003 | [2003/43] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9310212 (CASE GEORGE D [US], et al) [A] 1,4,6,7,11 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO9217788 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU]); | [Y]WO9705477 (AU MEMBRANE & BIOTECH RES INST [AU], et al); | [X]AU8045675 (CIBA GEIGY AG); | [X]AU5410190 (DU PONT); | [X]WO9517483 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [X]US4828960 (HERTOG CRAIG [US]); | [X]US5266227 (REICHELT HELMUT [DE], et al) | [Y] - WILLNER I., RUBIN S., "CONTROL OF THE STRUCTURE AND FUNCTIONS OF BIOMATERIALS BY LIGHT.", Angewandte Chemie International Edition, Wiley - V C H Verlag GmbH & Co. KGaA, DE, DE, (19960101), vol. 35., doi:10.1002/anie.199603671, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 367 - 385., XP000876500 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.199603671 | [Y] - GROVES J. T., ULMAN N., BOXER S. G., "MICROPATTERNING FLUID LIPID BILAYERS ON SOLID SUPPORTS.", Science, American Association for the Advancement of Science, US, US, (19970131), vol. 275., doi:10.1126/science.275.5300.651, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 651 - 653., XP000876503 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.275.5300.651 |