EP0981580 - NANO COMPOSITE FOR THERMAL INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2003 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT FÜR NEUE MATERIALIEN GEM. GMBH Im Stadtwald, Gebäude 43a 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/09] | For all designated states Institut Für Neue Materialien gem. GmbH Im Stadtwald, Gebäude 43a 66123 Saarbrücken / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMIDT, Helmut Im Königsfeld 29 D-66130 Saarbrücken / DE | 02 /
MENNIG, Martin Mittelstrasse 5 D-66287 Quierschied / DE | 03 /
JONSCHKER, Gerhard Grünewaldstrasse 12 D-66583 Spiesen-Elversberg / DE | [2000/09] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/09] | Barz, Peter Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98925602.9 | 13.05.1998 | [2000/09] | WO1998EP02843 | Priority number, date | DE1997120269 | 14.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19720269 | [2000/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9851739 | Date: | 19.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0981580 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0981580 | Date: | 31.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08K9/04, C09K21/00 | [2000/09] | CPC: |
C09K21/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/069 (EP,KR,US);
C03C14/004 (EP,KR,US);
C03C14/008 (EP,KR,US);
C04B14/064 (EP,KR,US);
C04B30/00 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2214/04 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2214/17 (EP,KR,US);
C03C2214/32 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B14/064, C04B20/023 (US,EP);
C04B30/00, C04B14/064 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2000/09] | Title | German: | NANOKOMPOSIT FÜR THERMISCHE ISOLIERZWECKE | [2000/09] | English: | NANO COMPOSITE FOR THERMAL INSULATION | [2000/09] | French: | NANOCOMPOSITE POUR ISOLATION THERMIQUE | [2000/09] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.1999 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.09.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 30.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0590978 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [A] 1,12-14 * claims 1,3-9 ** page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 30 *; | [A]EP0650945 (STARCK H C GMBH CO KG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,16,17 * * page 2, column 1, line 1 - line 6 * * page 5, column 7, line 1 - column 8, line 29 * * page 6, column 10, line 43 - line 51 *; | [A]EP0739856 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 3, line 38 - page 4, line 24 * * page 4 - page 5; example 1 *; | [A]DE19515820 (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 5, line 14 - line 30 *; | [A]WO9711040 (MC DONNELL DOUGLAS CORP [US], et al) [A] 1 * claims 1,3 * * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 27 * * page 8, line 14 - line 24 * * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 27 *; | [A]WO9716479 (INST NEUE MAT GEMEIN GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1 * claim 1 * * page 5, paragraph 4 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 2 * |