EP0983287 - NOVEL GLYCOSYLATED GINKGOLIDE DERIVATIVES, THEIR APPLICATION AS MEDICINES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE CONSEILS DE RECHERCHES ET D'APPLICATIONS SCIENTIFIQUES (S.C.R.A.S.) 51/53 rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE CONSEILS DE RECHERCHES ET D'APPLICATIONS SCIENTIFIQUES (S.C.R.A.S.) 51/53 rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASELLA, Andrea Langackerstrasse 7 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | 02 /
WEBER, Martin Schaffhauserstrasse 198 CH-8057 Zürich / CH | [2000/10] | Representative(s) | Bourgouin, André IPSEN (SCRAS) Direction Propriété Intellectuelle 42 rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/10] | Bourgouin, André BEAUFOUR IPSEN (S.C.A.F.) 42, rue du Docteur Blanche 75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98925761.3 | 20.05.1998 | [2000/10] | WO1998FR01016 | Priority number, date | FR19970006111 | 20.05.1997 Original published format: FR 9706111 | [2000/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9852959 | Date: | 26.11.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0983287 | Date: | 08.03.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0983287 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/04, A61K31/70 | [2000/10] | CPC: |
C07H17/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61P9/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/10] | Title | German: | GLYKOSYLIERTE-GINKGOLID-DERIVATE, IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS ARZNEIMITTELN UND PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUBEREITUNGEN DIE SIE ENTHALTEN | [2000/10] | English: | NOVEL GLYCOSYLATED GINKGOLIDE DERIVATIVES, THEIR APPLICATION AS MEDICINES AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS | [2000/10] | French: | NOUVEAUX DERIVES GLYCOSYLES DES GINKGOLIDES, LEUR APPLICATION EN TANT QUE MEDICAMENTS ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES CONTENANT | [2000/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.2003 | FI | 12.03.2003 | GB | 12.03.2003 | GR | 12.03.2003 | IE | 12.03.2003 | IT | 12.03.2003 | NL | 12.03.2003 | LU | 20.05.2003 | BE | 31.05.2003 | CH | 31.05.2003 | LI | 31.05.2003 | DK | 12.06.2003 | SE | 12.06.2003 | DE | 13.06.2003 | PT | 16.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/39] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GB | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
LU | 20.05.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
DE | 13.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GB | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
BE | 31.05.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
DE | 13.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GB | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
DK | 12.06.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
DE | 13.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GB | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
CH | 31.05.2003 | ||
LI | 31.05.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
DE | 13.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
DE | 13.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
IE | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
SE | 12.06.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 12.03.2003 | |
FI | 12.03.2003 | ||
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
GR | 12.03.2003 | ||
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | ||
PT | 16.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | FI | 12.03.2003 | |
NL | 12.03.2003 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE3514054 (SCRAS [FR]) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]FR2622448 (SCRAS [FR]) [DA] 1 * column W * |