EP0986587 - IMPROVED METHOD OF FLUIDIZED BED TEMPERATURE CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARRISH, John, Roberts 5002 Dempsey Drive Cross Lanes, WV 25313 / US | 02 /
MCNEIL, Thomas, James 105 Shan Lane Hurricane, WV 25526 / US | 03 /
HARTLEY, Ivan, Jeremy 105 Shan Lane Hurricane, WV 25526 / US | [2000/18] |
Former [2000/12] | 01 /
PARRISH, John, Roberts 5002 Dempsey Drive Cross Lanes, WV 25313 / US | ||
02 /
MCNEIL, Thomas, James 6 Live Oak Drive Inez, TX 77968 / US | |||
03 /
HARTLEY, Ivan, Jeremy 105 Shan Lane Hurricane, WV 25526 / US | Representative(s) | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd, et al Boult Wade Tennant, 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926123.5 | 29.05.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998US10953 | Priority number, date | US19970866637 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 866637 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854231 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986587 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986587 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08F10/00, C08F2/34 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
B01J8/1809 (EP,US);
B01J8/1836 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00026 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00044 (EP,US);
B01J2208/00097 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F2/00 (US,EP);
C08F10/00, C08F2/34 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES VERFAHREN ZUR TEMPERATURKONTROLLE IM WIRBELSCHICHTBETT | [2000/12] | English: | IMPROVED METHOD OF FLUIDIZED BED TEMPERATURE CONTROL | [2000/12] | French: | PROCEDE AMELIORE DE REGULATION DE LA TEMPERATURE D'UN LIT FLUIDISE | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 20.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 07.11.2001 | GR | 07.11.2001 | LI | 07.11.2001 | DK | 07.02.2002 | IE | 29.05.2002 | LU | 29.05.2002 | MC | 29.05.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2003/46] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
DK | 07.02.2002 | ||
IE | 29.05.2002 | ||
MC | 29.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
IE | 29.05.2002 | ||
MC | 29.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/25] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
MC | 29.05.2002 | ||
Former [2003/01] | CH | 07.11.2001 | |
GR | 07.11.2001 | ||
LI | 07.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/49] | GR | 07.11.2001 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4588790 (JENKINS III JOHN M [US], et al) [DA] 1-10; | [A]EP0241947 (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [A]EP0360094 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-10* claim - *; | [A]WO9425497 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10; | [A]WO9428032 (BP CHEM INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim - *; | [DA]US5462999 (GRIFFIN JOHN R [US], et al) [DA] 1-10; | [A]WO9708211 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-10 * claim - * |