EP0998749 - VOLATILE MATRICES FOR MATRIX-ASSISTED LASER DESORPTION/IONIZATION MASS SPECTROMETRY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEQUENOM, INC. 3595 John Hopkins Court San Diego California 92121 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states SEQUENOM, INC. 3595 John Hopkins Court San Diego, California 92121 / US | ||
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Genetrace Systems, Inc. 1401 Harbor Bay Parkway Alameda, CA 94502 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNTER, Joanna, M. 3830 Bret Harte Drive Redwood City, CA 94061 / US | 02 /
LIN, Hua 436-C Whitehall Road Alameda, CA 94501 / US | 03 /
BECKER, Christopher, H. 3404 Bryant Street Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/43] | Baldock, Sharon Claire, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2000/19] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926132.6 | 29.05.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US11003 | Priority number, date | US19970050932P | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 50932 P | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854751 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0998749 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01J49/04, H01J49/16 | [2000/19] | CPC: |
H01J49/164 (EP);
H01J49/0468 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | FLÜCHTIGE MATRIX FÜR MATRIX-UNTERSTÜTZTE LASERDESORPTIONS-(UND IONISATIONS-) MASSENSPEKTROSKOPIE | [2000/19] | English: | VOLATILE MATRICES FOR MATRIX-ASSISTED LASER DESORPTION/IONIZATION MASS SPECTROMETRY | [2000/19] | French: | MATRICES VOLATILES POUR SPECTROMETRIE DE MASSE A DESORPTION/IONISATION ASSISTEE PAR MATRICE | [2000/19] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 28.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 21.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 21.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.02.1999 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | 10.02.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.02.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   07.03.2000 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5135870 (WILLIAMS PETER ET AL) [DA] 1-3,6,12,13,19,25-29,32,33,36,38,48-55 * column 3, paragraphs 1-2 * * column 7; claims 1-11 *; | [DA]US5118937 (HILLENKAMP FRANZ ET AL) [DA] 1,38 * claims 27-34 *; | [DA]US4920264 (BECKER CHRISTOPHER H) [DA] 1,29,30,38,54 * column 5 - column 6 *; | [DPA]US5700642 (MONFORTE JOSEPH ALBERT ET AL) [DPA] 1 * abstract * |