EP0986336 - SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING PLATE TYPE RADIOFREQUENCY ABLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING PLATE TYPE RADIOFREQUENCY ABLATION | ||
[2004/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2005 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation doing business as Massachusetts General Hospital Fruit Street Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8201 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation doing business as Massachusetts General Hospital Fruit Street Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | |||
Former [2001/26] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Schwertstrasse 9 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | ||
For all designated states The General Hospital Corporation doing business as Massachusetts General Hospital Fruit Street Boston, Massachusetts 02114 / US | |||
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states Goldberg, S. Nahum 57 Addington Road Brookline, MA 02146 / US | ||
For all designated states Tanabe, Kenneth K. 133 Lexington Avenue Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | |||
For all designated states Rittman, William J., III 77 Locksley Road Lynnfield, MA 01940 / US | |||
For all designated states Cosman, Eric Richard 872 Concord Avenue Belmont Massachusetts 021 78 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goldberg, S. Nahum 57 Addington Road Brookline, Massachusetts 02146 / US | 02 /
Tanabe, Kenneth K. 133 Lexington Avenue Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | 03 /
Rittman, William J., III. 77 Locksley Road Lynnfield, Massachusetts 01940 / US | 04 /
Cosman, Eric R. 872 Concord Avenue Belmont, Massachusetts 02178 / US | [2001/26] |
Former [2000/12] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | ||
Former [2000/12] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate, Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926224.1 | 29.05.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998US11372 | Priority number, date | US19970866765 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: US 866765 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9853751 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986336 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986336 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/00 | [2004/21] | CPC: |
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00011 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00023 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00648 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00744 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00827 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00875 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00892 (EP,US);
A61B2018/142 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3782 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/12] | A61B17/39 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/12] | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT PLANARER ELEKTRODE ZUR HOCHFREQUENZ-ABLATION | [2004/21] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING PLATE TYPE RADIOFREQUENCY ABLATION | [2004/21] | French: | SYSTEME PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE ABLATION PAR FREQUENCES RADIOELECTRIQUES A L'AIDE DE PLAQUES | [2004/21] |
Former [2000/12] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN MIT PLANARER ELEKTRODE ZUR HOCHFREQUENZ-ABLATION | ||
Former [2000/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING PLATE TYPE RADIOFREQUENCY ABLATION | ||
Former [2000/12] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT D'EFFECTUER UNE ABLATION PAR FREQUENCE RADIOELECTRIQUES A L'AIDE DE PLAQUES | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1999 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 27.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0386246 (SHIMADZU CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6,10,12-14,17,20 * abstract * * page 7, line 22 - page 10, line 16 * * page 16, line 25 - page 17, line 8 * * page 24, line 6 - line 22 * [Y] 4,7,15-20; | [XY]FR2659017 (KUDRYAVTSEV JURY [SU], et al) [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - page 7, line 30 * [Y] 8,17,19,20; | [XY]FR2658424 (KOLMAKOV DMITRY [SU], et al) [X] 1-3,5,10 * abstract * * page 4, line 9 - line 20 * * page 5, line 30 - page 6, line 16 * [Y] 11,16; | [Y]US5220927 (ASTRAHAN MELVIN A [US], et al) [Y] 4,7,15,18 * abstract * * column 8, line 10 - line 68 * * column 13, line 57 - line 64 *; | [Y]US5503150 (EVANS GARY E [US]) [Y] 8 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - line 33 *; | [Y]DE19500691 (FUHR GUENTER PROF DR [DE], et al) [Y] 11 * abstract * * column 3, line 3 - line 16 * |