EP1013024 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING TRANSACTION MESSAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moore, Nancy Barclay 3001 Bridgeway, Nr. 334 Sausalito California 94965 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/12] | For all designated states Moore, Nancy Barclay 1001 Bridgeway no. 221 Sausalito, California 94965 / US | ||
Former [2000/26] | For all designated states Simple Access Partners, LLC Suite 500, One Sutter San Francisco, CA 94104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUGHES, Eric, G. 1819 Woolsey Street Berkeley, CA 94703 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/26] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926331.4 | 04.06.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US11638 | Priority number, date | US19970048568P | 04.06.1997 Original published format: US 48568 P | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9856129 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1013024 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G06F1/00, H04L9/32, G06F17/60 | [2005/31] | CPC: |
G06Q20/401 (EP,US);
H04L63/123 (EP,US);
H04L9/3236 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US);
H04L9/3297 (EP,US);
G06F16/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/26] | H04K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Extension states | AL | 24.12.1999 | LT | 24.12.1999 | LV | 24.12.1999 | MK | 24.12.1999 | RO | 24.12.1999 | SI | 24.12.1999 | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM VERARBEITEN VON TRANSAKTIONSNACHRICHTEN | [2000/26] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING TRANSACTION MESSAGES | [2000/26] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE MESSAGES DE TRANSACTION | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 24.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 31.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 19.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 04.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2001 | 30.06.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5018196 (TAKARAGI KAZUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-68 * abstract * * column 4, line 14 - column 5, line 27 * * column 6, line 33 - column 9, line 7 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US5337360 (FISCHER ADDISON M [US]) [X] 1-68 * abstract * * column 9, line 67 - column 10, line 39 * * column 11, line 21 - column 13, line 63 * * column 18, line 14 - column 20, line 2 ** figures 4,7-14,20,21 * | International search | [AP]US5757913 (BELLARE MIHIR [US], et al); | [AE]US5787175 (CARTER STEPHEN R [US]) |