EP0923741 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A ROTATION ANGLE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Simula, Inc. 2625 South Plaza Drive, Suite 1000 Tempe, AZ 85282 / US | For all designated states Schaefer, Philip Apartment C15, 65 Verde Valley School Road Sedona, AZ 86336 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/36] | For all designated states Simula, Inc. 2625 South Plaza Drive, Suite 1000 Tempe, AZ 85282 / US | ||
For all designated states Schaefer, Philip Apartment C15, 65 Verde Valley School Road Sedona, AZ 86336 / US | |||
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states Simula, Inc. Suite 1000, 2700 N. Central Avenue Phoenix, AZ 85004 / US | ||
For all designated states Schaefer, Philip Apartment C15, 65 Verde Valley School Road Sedona, AZ 86336 / US | |||
Former [1999/25] | For all designated states Simula, Inc. 10016 S. 51st Street Phoenix, AZ 85044 / US | ||
For all designated states Schaefer, Philip Apartment C15, 65 Verde Valley School Road Sedona, AZ 86336 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAEFER, Philip Apartment C15 65 Verde Valley School Road Sedona, AZ 86336 / US | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/25] | O'Connell, David Christopher Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98926355.3 | 05.06.1998 | [1999/25] | WO1998US11679 | Priority number, date | US19970048738 | 05.06.1997 Original published format: US 48738 | US19970062336 | 15.10.1997 Original published format: US 62336 | [1999/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855836 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923741 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01P15/08, G01P13/00, G01C9/00, G01F1/32, G01F1/06, G01F3/00, H01J5/16, G01C9/06, G01C9/08, B60R21/00 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
G01P15/093 (EP,US);
G01B11/26 (KR);
G01D5/30 (EP,US);
G01P15/006 (EP,US);
G01P15/0888 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/25] | Title | German: | DREHWINKELSENSOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DES DREHWINKELS | [2003/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR A ROTATION ANGLE SENSOR | [1999/25] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL UTILES POUR UN CAPTEUR D'ANGLE DE ROTATION | [1999/25] |
Former [1999/25] | DREHWINKELSENSOR | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 03.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 12.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/41] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2550847 (SHORT BROTHERS & HARLAND LTD) [X] 1-3,18 * page 3, line 9 - page 5, paragraph L; figure 1 * [A] 4; | [DA]US4163325 (HUGHES DAVID [GB]) [DA] 1,18 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 19; figure . *; | [A]US4232553 (BENEDETTO KENNETH R, et al) [A] 1,18 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5416977 (STRIFFLER FOSTER L [US]) [DA] 1-6,18-20 * the whole document *; | [DA] - "DETECTION OF INCIPIENT ROLLOVERS GROWS IN IMPORTANCE", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING, (199709), vol. 105, no. 9, pages 94 - 96, XP000721375 [DA] 1-6,18-20 * page 95, column L, paragraph 4 * | International search | [X]US3680378 (AURILIO GIUSEPPE, et al); | [Y]US3940983 (GREENE LEONARD M); | [Y]US4825708 (SEVICK PETER M [US]); | [X]US4976157 (BERTHOLD JOHN W [US], et al); | [A]US5120951 (SMALL JAMES G [US]) |