EP0914269 - WIPER BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.11.2003 [2003/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTLARSKI, Thomas Hauptstrasse 58a D-77830 Bühlertal / DE | [1999/19] | Application number, filing date | 98928059.9 | 24.03.1998 | [1999/19] | WO1998DE00858 | Priority number, date | DE1997118490 | 02.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19718490 | [1999/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850261 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914269 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914269 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38, B60S1/40 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
B60S1/4006 (EP,US);
B60S1/38 (EP,US);
B60S1/3855 (EP,US);
B60S1/3867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/19] | Title | German: | WISCHBLATT FÜR SCHEIBEN VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | [1999/19] | English: | WIPER BLADE | [1999/19] | French: | BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/27] | 06.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Request for further processing for: | 12.12.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 12.12.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.01.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR1069875 (TRICO FOLBERTH LTD) [Y] 1,2,8 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2268671 (FISTER SAS BOSSO GIACOMO ET CO [IT]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5437077 (O'DONNELL LESTER R [US]) [Y] 1,2,8 * figure - * * column 1, line 34 - column 2, line 14 *; | [PA]DE19627115 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1,8-11* column 3, lines 37-62; figure 2 * |