EP0914571 - TORSIONAL DAMPER, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE FRICTION CLUTCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EMBRAYAGES s.a.s. 5, Avenue Roger Dumoulin 80009 Amiens Cedex 1 / FR | [2003/01] |
Former [1999/19] | For all designated states VALEO 43, rue Bayen 75017 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRATON, Michel 7, boulevard Mortier F-75020 Paris / FR | 02 /
TAUVRON, Fabrice 9, rue E. Lecrivain F-91200 Athis-Mons / FR | [1999/19] | Representative(s) | Lemaire, Marc, et al VALEO TRANSMISSIONS, Service Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15, rue des Rosiers 93585 Saint Ouen Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | Lemaire, Marc, et al VALEO TRANSMISSIONS, Service Propriété Industrielle, Le Triangle, 15, rue des Rosiers 93585 Saint Ouen Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1999/19] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services Propriété Industrielle 2, rue André Boulle, B.P. 150 94004 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 98928375.9 | 28.05.1998 | [1999/19] | WO1998FR01068 | Priority number, date | FR19970006657 | 30.05.1997 Original published format: FR 9706657 | [1999/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9854487 | Date: | 03.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0914571 | Date: | 12.05.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0914571 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/123 | [1999/19] | CPC: |
F16F15/1236 (EP,US);
F16F15/123 (KR);
F16F15/1238 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [1999/19] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM DÄMPFEN VON DREHSCHWINGUNGEN, INSBESONDERE KUPPLUNGSSCHEIBE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [1999/19] | English: | TORSIONAL DAMPER, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLE FRICTION CLUTCH | [1999/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF AMORTISSEUR DE TORSION, NOTAMMENT POUR FRICTION D'EMBRAYAGE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [1999/19] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]FR2735548 (VALEO [FR]) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0732525 (VALEO [FR]); | [A]DE29611793U (FICHTEL & SACHS AG [DE]); | [A]FR2531162 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]); | [A]DE19642913 (EXEDY CORP [JP]); | [A]US4852711 (KITANO SEIICHI [JP], et al) | by applicant | FR2735548 |