EP0979284 - REAGENTS FOR VACCINATION WHICH GENERATE A CD8 T CELL IMMUNE RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/07] | METHODS AND REAGENTS FOR VACCINATION WHICH GENERATE A CD8 T CELL IMMUNE RESPONSE | ||
[2002/30] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2014 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oxxon Therapeutics Limited Oxford, OX4 4GP / GB | [2004/34] |
Former [2000/07] | For all designated states Oxxon Pharmaccines Limited Boswell House, 1-5 Broad Street Oxford, OX1 3AW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McMICHAEL, Andrew, James Midsummer Cottage Church Street Beckley Oxford OX3 9UT / GB | 02 /
HILL, Adrian, Vivian, Sinton 2 St. Andrew's Road Oxford OX3 9DL / GB | 03 /
GILBERT, Sarah, Catherine 65 Dene Road Headington Oxford OX3 7EQ / GB | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Joerg 11 Malford Road Barton Oxford OX3 8BT / GB | 05 /
PLEBANSKI, Magdalena Nuffield Dept. of Medicine John Radcliffe Hospital Oxford OX3 9DU / GB | 06 /
HANKE, Tomas Molecular Immunology Group Institute of Molecular Medicine Headington Oxford OX3 9DS / GB | 07 /
SMITH, Geoffrey, Lilley University of Oxford Sir William Dunn Schl. of Pathology South Parks Rd Oxford OX1 3RE / GB | 08 /
BLANCHARD, Tom MRC Laboratories Fajara P.O. Box 273 Banjul / GM | [2000/07] | Representative(s) | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/28] | Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2004/34] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2004/11] | Stolzenburg, Friederike, et al Vossius & Partner Postfach 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Maschio, Antonio D Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | ||
Former [2000/25] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2000/07] | Pennant, Pyers Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins, 1 Serjeants' Inn, Fleet Street London EC4Y 1NT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98928434.4 | 09.06.1998 | [2000/07] | WO1998GB01681 | Priority number, date | GB19970011957 | 09.06.1997 Original published format: GB 9711957 | [2000/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9856919 | Date: | 17.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0979284 | Date: | 16.02.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0979284 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0979284 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/30, C12N15/48, C12N15/86, A61K45/00, A61K39/015, A61K39/21 | [2000/07] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (EP,US);
A61K39/015 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/145 (EP,US);
A61K39/21 (EP,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/445 (EP,US);
A61K2039/51 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/54 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55522 (EP,US);
A61K2039/57 (EP,US);
C12N2710/10343 (EP,US);
C12N2710/24043 (EP,US);
C12N2710/24143 (EP,US);
C12N2740/15034 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16234 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16122 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/07] | Title | German: | REAGENZIEN ZUR IMPFUNG, DIE EINE CD8 T-ZELL-IMMUNANTWORT ERZEUGEN | [2002/30] | English: | REAGENTS FOR VACCINATION WHICH GENERATE A CD8 T CELL IMMUNE RESPONSE | [2002/30] | French: | REACTIFS DE VACCINATION PERMETTANT DE GENERER UNE REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE DES CELLULES T CD8 | [2002/30] |
Former [2000/07] | VERFAHREN UND REAGENZIEN ZUR IMPFUNG, DIE EINE CD8 T-ZELL-IMMUNANTWORT ERZEUGEN | ||
Former [2000/07] | METHODS AND REAGENTS FOR VACCINATION WHICH GENERATE A CD8 T CELL IMMUNE RESPONSE | ||
Former [2000/07] | PROCEDE REACTIF DE VACCINATION PERMETTANT DE GENERER UNE REPONSE IMMUNITAIRE DE CELLULES T CD8 | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/07] | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | EP02079736.1 / EP1335023 | EP04029353.2 / EP1616954 | EP04029354.0 / EP1589108 | EP08006920.6 / EP2058399 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
WITHDRAWN BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | 02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue du Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | 03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | 04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | 05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Markus, Marc Andreas Pfizer ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / FR | 06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Danisco US Inc. 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Schuller, Cornelis, et al, et al Innogenetics N.V. P.O. Box 4 9052 Ghent / BE | 07
02.10.2003
20.05.2005
WITHDRAWN Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 1209 Orange Street City of Wilmington County of New Castle / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
WITHDRAWN BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI PASTEUR 2, avenue du Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Markus, Marc Andreas Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Danisco US Inc 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Schuller, Cornelis, et al, et al Innogenetics N.V. Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7 P.O. Box 4 9052 Ghent / BE | |||
07
02.10.2003
20.05.2005
WITHDRAWN Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 1209 Orange Street City of Wilmington County of New Castle / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
Former [2007/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
WITHDRAWN BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI PASTEUR 2, avenue du Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Danisco US Inc 925 Page Mill Road Palo Alto CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Schuller, Cornelis, et al, et al Innogenetics N.V. Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7 P.O. Box 4 9052 Ghent / BE | |||
07
02.10.2003
20.05.2005
WITHDRAWN Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 1209 Orange Street City of Wilmington County of New Castle / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
Former [2007/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
WITHDRAWN BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI PASTEUR 2, avenue du Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 925 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Schüller, Cornelis, et al, et al Innogenetics N.V. Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7 P.O. Box 4 9052 Ghent / BE | |||
07
02.10.2003
20.05.2005
WITHDRAWN Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 1209 Orange Street City of Wilmington County of New Castle / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
Former [2005/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
WITHDRAWN BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI PASTEUR 2, avenue du Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 925 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Schüller, Cornelis, et al, et al Innogenetics N.V. Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7 P.O. Box 4 9052 Ghent / BE | |||
07
02.10.2003
20.05.2005
WITHDRAWN Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
Former [2005/33] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI PASTEUR 2, avenue du Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 925 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Schüller, Cornelis Innogenetics N.V. Industriepark Zwijnaarde 7 P.O. Box 4 9052 Ghent / BE | |||
07
02.10.2003
20.05.2005
WITHDRAWN Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
Former [2005/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI PASTEUR 2, avenue du Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 925 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
07
02.10.2003
20.05.2005
WITHDRAWN Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
Former [2005/28] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE SANOFI PASTEUR 2, avenue du Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Sanofi Pasteur 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 925 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
07
02.10.2003
03.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
Former [2003/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE AVENTIS PASTEUR 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 LYON / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Aventis Pasteur SA, 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 925 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
07
02.10.2003
03.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE Chiron Corporation 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608-2917 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
Former [2003/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE AVENTIS PASTEUR 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 LYON / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Aventis Pasteur SA, 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
04
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE Therion Biologics Corporation 76 Rogers Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US Opponent's representative Brown, David Leslie Haseltine, Lake & Co, Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | |||
05
02.10.2003
01.12.2003
ADMISSIBLE POWDERJECT VACCINES INC. 585 Science Drive, Suite C Madison, Wisconsin 53711 / US Opponent's representative Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | |||
06
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC. 925 Page Mill Rd. Palo Alto, CA 94304-1013 / US Opponent's representative Hallybone, Huw George Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
Former [2003/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | ||
02
01.10.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE AVENTIS PASTEUR 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 LYON / FR Opponent's representative Schaeffer, Nathalie Christiane Aventis Pasteur SA, 2, avenue Pont Pasteur 69007 Lyon / FR | |||
03
02.10.2003
12.01.2004
ADMISSIBLE OXFORD BIOMEDICA (UK) LTD. Medawar Centre Robert Robinson Avenue The Oxford Science Park Oxford OX4 4GA / GB Opponent's representative Goodfellow, Hugh Robin Carpmaels & Ransford, 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | |||
Former [2003/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.09.2003
27.11.2003
ADMISSIBLE BAVARIAN NORDIC A/S 23, Ved Amagerbanen 2300 Copenhagen S / DK Opponent's representative Alt, Michael Bavarian Nordic GmbH, Fraunhoferstrasse 18b 82152 Martinsried / DE | 16.01.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.11.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.09.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2006 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 22.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 06.07.2009 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 03.12.2009 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 15.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.04.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 10.04.2007 | Appeal received No. T0534/07 | 11.06.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 23.05.2007 | Appeal received No. T0534/07 | 08.06.2007 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.11.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 05.04.2007 | Appeal received No. T0534/07 | 25.11.2008 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 25.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2008 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |