EP0991706 - FILLED POLYMER COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2004 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC. Washington Street - 1790 Building Midland MI 48674 / US | [2008/38] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies Inc. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies, Inc. Washington Street, 1790 Building Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY 2030 Dow Center Midland, Michigan 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEUNG, Yunwa, W. 104 Rosemary Lane Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 02 /
BIESER, John, O. 2115 Banks Houston, TX 77098 / US | 03 /
GUEST, Martin, J. 58 Yaupon Court Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | 04 /
THOEN, Johan, A. Dommelstraat 22 NL-4535 HB Terneuzen / NL | 05 /
GATHERS, John, J. 3615 Hanover Circle Pearland, TX 77584 / US | [2000/24] |
Former [2000/15] | 01 /
CHEUNG, Yunwa, W. Apartment 810 510 That Way Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | ||
02 /
BIESER, John, O. 2115 Banks Houston, TX 77098 / US | |||
03 /
GUEST, Martin, J. 106 Greenbriar Lake Jackson, TX 77566 / US | |||
04 /
THOEN, Johan, A. Dommelstraat 22 NL-4535 HB Terneuzen / NL | |||
05 /
GATHERS, John, J. 3615 Hanover Circle Pearland, TX 77584 / US | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 98929012.7 | 22.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US12177 | Priority number, date | US19970882819 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: US 882819 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900449 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991706 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991706 | Date: | 10.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/00, C08L25/08, C08L23/02, C08J5/18, B32B27/00 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B32B27/28 (EP,US);
C08K3/00 (KR);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/06 (US);
B32B27/20 (US);
B32B27/302 (US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
C08K3/01 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
B32B2471/00 (US);
B32B2607/02 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/01, C08L25/08 (US,EP);
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/08, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | GEFÜLLTE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2000/15] | English: | FILLED POLYMER COMPOSITIONS | [2000/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POLYMERES A MATERIAU DE REMPLISSAGE | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 08.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 16.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.02.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2003 | BE | 10.09.2003 | CH | 10.09.2003 | FI | 10.09.2003 | LI | 10.09.2003 | DK | 10.12.2003 | GR | 10.12.2003 | SE | 10.12.2003 | PT | 18.12.2003 | [2004/41] |
Former [2004/31] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
PT | 18.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
BE | 10.09.2003 | ||
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
CH | 10.09.2003 | ||
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
LI | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/16] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
SE | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/14] | AT | 10.09.2003 | |
FI | 10.09.2003 | ||
GR | 10.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/12] | FI | 10.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS60155210 ; | [X]JPH02173138 ; | [X]GB2262287 (EVODE LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,4-9 * claims 1,5-7 *; | [X]US5530055 (NEEDHAM DONALD G [US]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * column 3, line 51 - line 59 * * claims 1,8,9 *; | [E]WO9829479 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [E] 1,2,4-10 * claims 1,2 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 85, no. 39, Database accession no. 85-239384, XP002080125 & JPS60155210 A 19850815 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 33, Database accession no. 90-249842, XP002080126 & JPH02173138 A 19900704 (NIPPON GE PLASTICS KK) [X] 1,2,4-9 * abstract * | [X] - RUIZ, F.A., "Mineral reinforcement of linear low density polyethylene film", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940613), vol. 120, no. 24, Database accession no. 300105q, page 52, column 2, XP002080123 [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * | [X] - ANNU. TECH. CONF.-SOC. PLAST.ENG, (1992), vol. 50, no. 1, pages 1670 - 1672 [X] 1,2,4-10 | [X] - RUIZ, FRANK A., "Mineral reinforcement of linear-low density polyethylene film", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930823), vol. 119, no. 8, Database accession no. 74061t, page 71, column 2, XP002080124 [X] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * | [X] - TAPPI J., (1993), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 174 - 177 [X] 1,2,4-10 |