EP0993420 - DEVICE FOR MIXING AND AERATING LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2002 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.11.2002 [2002/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aquasystems International N.V. Brusselsesteenweg 508 1500 Halle / BE | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAEGEMAN, Johny, Hector Koning Boudewijnlaan 20 B-1500 Halle / BE | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Overath, Philippe Cabinet Bede Boulevard Général Wahis 15 1030 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Overath, Philippe Cabinet Bede, Place de l'Alma, 3 1200 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 98929140.6 | 24.06.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998BE00096 | Priority number, date | BE19970000564 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: BE 9700564 | [2000/16] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901386 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0993420 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0993420 | Date: | 28.11.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/16, B01F3/04 | [2000/16] | CPC: |
C02F3/16 (EP,US);
B01F33/503 (EP,US);
B01F23/23313 (EP,US);
B01F23/23365 (EP,US);
B01F23/23367 (EP,US);
B01F23/23421 (EP,US);
B01F27/25 (EP,US);
C02F3/165 (EP,US);
B01F27/1144 (EP,US);
B01F27/231 (EP,US);
B01F27/61 (EP,US);
B01F27/80 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, PT [2000/16] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR MISCHUNG UND BELÜFTUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2000/16] | English: | DEVICE FOR MIXING AND AERATING LIQUIDS | [2000/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MELANGE ET D'AERATION DE LIQUIDES | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1999 | Translation filed | 20.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 30.01.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3865909 (CRAMER JR ROY A) [X] 1-5,10 * column 2, line 7 - line 20 * * column 5, line 1 - column 6, line 15 * * figures 1,5 * [Y] 7; | [Y]US4869818 (DIGREGORIO DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 7 * column 2, line 9 - line 13 *; | [A]JPS57177394 ; | [A]JPS57113891 ; | [A]CH527773 (KAELIN J R [CH]) [A] 1,2,6,10 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 28; figure 1 *; | [DA]FR2609459 (TECH MELANGE INDL [FR]) [DA] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 8 * * page 3, line 16 - line 17 * * page 3, line 25 - line 27 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US4290885 (KWAK DOCHAN) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0366644 (HAEGEMAN J H) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830128), vol. 007, no. 022, Database accession no. (C - 148), & JP57177394 A 19821101 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 1-5,8 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19821020), vol. 006, no. 208, Database accession no. (C - 130), & JP57113891 A 19820715 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |