EP0991569 - BLADE PROFILE FOR AIRCRAFT ROTOR AND ROTOR COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.2003 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2003 [2003/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Office National d'Etudes et de Recherches Aérospatiales (ONERA) 29, Avenue de la Division-Leclerc 92320 Châtillon / FR | For all designated states EUROCOPTER Aéroport International Marseille-Provence 13725 Marignane Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/34] | For all designated states ONERA (Office National d'Etudes et de Recherches Aérospatiales) 29, Avenue de la Division-Leclerc 92320 Châtillon / FR | ||
For all designated states EUROCOPTER Aéroport International Marseille-Provence 13725 Marignane Cédex / FR | |||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states ONERA (Office National d'Etudes et de Recherches Aérospatiales) 29, Avenue de la Division-Leclerc 92320 Châtillon / FR | ||
For all designated states EUROCOPTER Aéroport International Marseille-Provence F-13725 Marignane Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODDE, Anne, Marie 12, allée des Alouettes F-91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR | 02 /
RENEAUX, Jo[l 14, rue Léon Croc F-91400 Orsay / FR | 03 /
THIBERT, Jean, Jacques 1, square des Erables F-91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Bonnetat, Christian CABINET BONNETAT 29, rue de St. Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 98929498.8 | 05.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998FR01147 | Priority number, date | FR19970007915 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: FR 9707915 | [2000/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900298 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991569 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991569 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/467 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
B64C27/467 (EP,US);
Y10S416/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/15] | Title | German: | DREHFLÜGELBLATT FÜR HUBSCHRAUBER UND DREHFLÜGELBLATT MIT SOLCHEM PROFIL | [2000/15] | English: | BLADE PROFILE FOR AIRCRAFT ROTOR AND ROTOR COMPRISING SAME | [2000/15] | French: | PROFIL DE PALE POUR VOILURE TOURNANTE D'AERONEF ET PALE POUR VOILURE TOURNANTE PRESENTANT UN TEL PROFIL | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 26.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4412664 (NOONAN KEVIN W [US]) [A] 1,3,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4459083 (BINGHAM GENE J [US]) [X] 1,8 * the whole document * [A] 2,5,7; | [AD]US4569633 (FLEMMING JR ROBERT J [US]) [AD] 1,3,7 * column 2, line 64 - column 3, line 33 * * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 36 * * figure - *; | [A]US4830574 (WAINAUSKI HARRY S [US], et al) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | US3728045 | US4142837 | FR2463054 | FR2485470 | US4314795 | US4569633 | US4744728 | EP0715467 |