EP0919950 - MODULE FOR IC CARD, IC CARD, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MODULE FOR IC CARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | [2007/14] |
Former [1999/22] | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRAI, Minoru, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | 02 /
UEDA, Shigeyuki, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | 03 /
MIYATA, Osamu Rohm Co., Ltd., 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | 04 /
HORIO, Tomoharu, Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho, Ukyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 615-0045 / JP | [1999/22] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/20] | GROSSE BOCKHORNI SCHUMACHER Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [1999/22] | Schumacher, Horst, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte, PALGEN SCHUMACHER & KLUIN, Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98929674.4 | 23.06.1998 | [1999/22] | WO1998JP02832 | Priority number, date | JP19970166321 | 23.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16632197 | JP19970166322 | 23.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16632297 | [1999/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859317 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0919950 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0919950 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/10, G06K19/077 | [2001/16] | CPC: |
H01Q7/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/00 (KR);
G06K19/07718 (EP,US);
G06K19/07745 (EP,US);
G06K19/07747 (EP,US);
G06K19/07779 (EP,US);
G06K19/07783 (EP,US);
H01Q1/2225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01037 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1999/22] | G06K19/00, B42D15/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1999/50] |
Former [1999/22] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | MODUL FÜR IC-KARTE, IC-KARTE UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [1999/22] | English: | MODULE FOR IC CARD, IC CARD, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING MODULE FOR IC CARD | [1999/22] | French: | MODULE POUR CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE, CARTE A CIRCUIT INTEGRE, ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL MODULE | [1999/22] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.1999 | Translation filed | 27.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.1999 | Search fee paid | 27.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 24.03.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 25.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.05.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2673039 (EM MICROELECTRONIC MARIN SA [CH]) [X] 1-3,7-9,15 * claims 1,6 *; | [X]US4725924 (JUAN ALAIN [CH]) [X] 1 * column 6, line 33 - line 39 * | International search | [A]JPS6378796 (HITACHI MAXELL); | [A]JPS6337998 (KASEI CO C I, et al) | Examination | GB1228854 | EP0307773 |