EP1046648 - 3'-DEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi Saitama 351-0198 / JP | For all designated states Wako Pure Chemical Industies, Ltd. 1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0045 / JP | For all designated states Nippon Genetech Co. Ltd. Kongo Nishiki-cho, Bldg., 5, Kanda-Nishiki-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/14] | For all designated states THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | ||
For all designated states Wako Pure Chemical Industies, Ltd. 1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | |||
For all designated states Nippon Genetech Co. Ltd. Kongo Nishiki-cho, Bldg., 5, Kanda-Nishiki-cho, 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0054 / JP | |||
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states THE INSTITUTE OF PHYSICAL & CHEMICAL RESEARCH 2-1, Hirosawa Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0198 / JP | ||
For all designated states Wako Pure Chemical Industies, Ltd. 1-2, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | |||
For all designated states Hayashizaki, Yoshihide The Institute of Physical and Chemical Research Tsukuba Life Science Centre, 1-1, Koyadai 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0074 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYASHIZAKI, Yoshihide 1-1, Koyodai 3-chome Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki 305-0074 / JP | 02 /
OZAWA, Kaori, Wako Pure Chemical Industries, Ltd. 6-1, Takada-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0963 / JP | 03 /
FUJIO, Kazunari, Wako Pure Chemical Ind. Ltd. 6-1, Takado-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0963 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Takumi, Wako Pure Chemical Industries, Ltd 6-1, Takada-cho Amagasaki-shi, Hyogo 661-0963 / JP | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Godemeyer, Thomas polypatent An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Godemeyer, Thomas, Dr. Sternagel, Fleischer, Godemeyer & Partner Patentanwälte An den Gärten 7 51491 Overath / DE | Application number, filing date | 98929852.6 | 06.07.1998 | [2000/43] | WO1998JP03038 | Priority number, date | JP19970180879 | 07.07.1997 Original published format: JP 18087997 | JP19980155774 | 04.06.1998 Original published format: JP 15577498 | [2000/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902543 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046648 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/10, C07H19/20, C12Q1/68, C07H21/00 | [2002/37] | CPC: |
C07H19/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/43] | C07H19/10, C07H19/14, C07H19/20, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/43] | Title | German: | 3'-DESOXYRIBONUKLEOTID-DERIVATE | [2000/43] | English: | 3'-DEOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE DERIVATIVES | [2000/43] | French: | DERIVES DE 3'-DESOXYRIBONUCLEOTIDE | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.1999 | Translation filed | 22.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.1999 | Search fee paid | 28.05.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.04.1999 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.07.1999 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 23.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CY, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 05.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/32] | 21.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.05.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | 21.05.1999 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | 21.05.1999 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | 21.05.1999 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | 21.05.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | 21.05.1999 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | 21.05.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | 21.05.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | 21.05.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.05.1999 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   28.05.1999 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5332666 (PROBER JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * examples 5-8; claims 1-14 *; | [Y]US5151507 (HOBBS JR FRANK W [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9749769 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [PX] 1-12 * the whole document, but especially claims 16-24 *; | [E]EP0978569 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO [JP], et al) [E] 1-12 * the whole document, but especially claims 19-24 * | International search | [XP]JPH10158293 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO, et al); | [Y]JPH04320699 (NISSHIN SPINNING); | [Y]JPH085908B ; | [XP] - SASAKI N., ET AL., "TRANSCRIPTIONAL SEQUENCING: A METHOD FOR DNA SEQUENCING USING RNA POLYMERASE.", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, National Academy of Sciences, US, US, (19980331), vol. 95., doi:10.1073/pnas.95.7.3455, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3455 - 3460., XP002912287 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.7.3455 | [Y] - AXELROD V. D., KRAMER F. R., "TRANSCRIPTION FROM BACTERIOPHAGE T7 AND SP6 RNA POLYMERASE PROMOTERS IN THE PRESENCE OF 3'-DEOXYRIBONUCLEOSIDE 5'-TRIPHOSPHATE CHAIN TERMINATORS.", Biochemistry, American Chemical Society, US, US, (19850101), vol. 24., doi:10.1021/bi00342a005, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 5716 - 5723., XP002912288 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00342a005 |