EP1032345 - FLUID ACQUISITION/TRANSFER LAYER IN AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE | [2000/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAGNUSSON, Ing-Britt Oxelvägen 22 S-435 37 Mölnlycke / SE | 02 /
STEGER, Christina Eklanda Hage 49 S-431 49 Mölndal / SE | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Gothenburg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Valea AB Lindholmspiren 5 417 56 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2000/36] | Hammond, Andrew David, et al Göteborgs Patentbyra Dahls AB, Sjöporten 4 417 64 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98930025.6 | 23.06.1998 | [2000/36] | WO1998SE01223 | Priority number, date | SE19970002461 | 26.06.1997 Original published format: SE 9702461 | [2000/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900098 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032345 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032345 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/46, B32B5/02 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
A61F13/53747 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15406 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15447 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530175 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53024 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitaufnehmende und flüssigkeitleitende Schicht für absorbierende Artikel | [2002/40] | English: | FLUID ACQUISITION/TRANSFER LAYER IN AN ABSORBENT ARTICLE | [2000/36] | French: | COUCHE D'ABSORPTION/DE TRANSFERT DE FLUIDE D'UN ARTICLE ABSORBANT | [2000/36] |
Former [2000/36] | FLÜSSIGKEITAUFNEHMENDE UND FLÜSSIGKEITSLEITENDE SCHICHT FÜR ABSORBIERNEDE ARTIKEL | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/36] | 06.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP01260051 ; | [A]JP01298206 ; | [A]US4652484 (SHIBA DAISUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US4883707 (NEWKIRK DAVID D [US]); | [A]DE19517348 (INVENTA AG [CH]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (C-675), Vol. 14, No. 17; & JP,A,01 260 051 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO LTD), "Fiber Web", (17-10-89)., & JP01260051 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (C-689), Vol. 14, No. 80; & JP,A,01 298 206 (TOYOBO CO LTD), "Hollow Conjugated Yarn", (01-12-89)., & JP01298206 A 00000000 |