EP1001795 - VASOPROTECTIVE RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUS VECTOR CONTAINING A HUMAN TFPI GENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Heart Institute Texas Medical Center MC-1268, P.O. Box 20345 Houston, TX 77225-0345 / US | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOLDHELYI, Pierre 4412 Jane Street Bellaire, TX 77410 / US | 02 /
WILLERSON, James, T. 3314 Georgetown Road Houston, TX 77005 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Wise, Stephen James, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Wise, Stephen James, et al c/o RAWORTH, MOSS & COOK 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930076.9 | 05.06.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998US11706 | Priority number, date | US19970051887P | 08.07.1997 Original published format: US 51887 P | US19980013366 | 26.01.1998 Original published format: US 13366 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902171 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001795 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/76, A61K48/00, C12N15/63, C12N15/64, C12N15/86 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/8114 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
A61K48/00 (EP,US);
C12N2799/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/21] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTER, GEFÄSSSCHONENDER ADENOVIRUS-VEKTOR, DER EIN TFPI-GEN ENTHÄLT | [2000/21] | English: | VASOPROTECTIVE RECOMBINANT ADENOVIRUS VECTOR CONTAINING A HUMAN TFPI GENE | [2000/21] | French: | VECTEUR ADENOVIRAL RECOMBINANT VASOPROTECTEUR CONTENANT UN GENE TFPI HUMAIN | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 12.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/13] | 26.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9604378 (CHIRON CORP [US]); | [Y]US5589363 (ROY SOUMITRA [US], et al); | [Y]WO9720939 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | International search | [Y]JPH09124506 (CHEMO SERO THERAPEUT RES INST); |