EP0991909 - ELECTRONIC CIRCUITRY FOR TIMING AND DELAY CIRCUITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2005 [2005/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE ENSIGN-BICKFORD COMPANY 660 Hopmeadow Street Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | [2004/23] |
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states THE ENSIGN BICKFORD COMPANY 660 Hopmeadow Street Simsbury, Connecticut 06070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATTI, Robert, S. 15751 Avon Drive Warrenville, IL 60555 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98930135.3 | 16.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US12112 | Priority number, date | US19970879162 | 19.06.1997 Original published format: US 879162 | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858228 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991909 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991909 | Date: | 02.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F42C11/06 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
F42B3/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE ZEIT- UND VERZÖGERUNGSSCHALTUNG | [2004/01] | English: | ELECTRONIC CIRCUITRY FOR TIMING AND DELAY CIRCUITS | [2000/15] | French: | CIRCUITS ELECTRONIQUES UTILES POUR DES CIRCUITS DE TEMPORISATION ET DE RETARDEMENT | [2000/15] |
Former [2000/15] | ELEKTRONISCHE ZEIT-UND VERZÖGERUNGSSCHALTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 13.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9633384 (ENSIGN BICKFORD CO [US]) [X] 1,9,10 * page 7, line 25 - page 16, line 18; figures 1-5 *[A] 3,8 | by applicant | US3981240 | US4607573 | US5377592 | US5435248 |