EP1013068 - ELECTRONIC MAIL DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM FOR INTEGRATED ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cranberry Properties, LLC 22000 Aol Way Dulles, VA 20166 / US | [2000/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OWENS, Stephen, J., H. 5945 West Parker 3123 Plano, TX 75093 / US | 02 /
FINNEY, Michael, S. 2885 Bohlen Drive Hilliard, OH 43026 / US | 03 /
SNIDER, Michael, L. 1078 Blind Brook Drive Columbus, OH 43235 / US | 04 /
WRIGHT, Randall, S. 290 Bryant Avenue Worthington, OH 43085 / US | 05 /
PAYNTER, James, W. 3327 Darby Glen Boulevard Hilliard, OH 43026 / US | 06 /
BARD, Robin, R. 2896 Sawdust Lane Dublin, OH 43017 / US | [2000/26] | Representative(s) | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/26] | Murgatroyd, Susan Elizabeth, et al Baron & Warren 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930288.0 | 17.06.1998 | [2000/26] | WO1998US12531 | Priority number, date | US19970877614 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: US 877614 | [2000/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9858491 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1013068 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1013068 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, G06F17/30, H04M3/50 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
H04L51/066 (EP,US);
H04L51/214 (EP,US);
H04L51/56 (EP,US);
H04M3/5307 (EP,US);
H04M3/53333 (EP,US);
H04N1/00209 (EP,US);
H04N1/00212 (EP,US);
H04N1/00214 (EP,US);
H04N1/00217 (EP,US);
H04N1/324 (EP,US);
H04N1/32416 (EP,US);
H04L51/212 (EP,US);
H04M2201/60 (EP,US);
H04M2203/301 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4509 (EP,US);
H04M2203/4536 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0086 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99939 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/21] | H04L12/58, G06F17/60, H04M3/53 | ||
Former IPC [2000/26] | H04N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/26] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES POSTVERTEILSYSTEM FÜR INTEGRIERTE ELEKTRONISCHE KOMMUNIKATION | [2000/26] | English: | ELECTRONIC MAIL DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM FOR INTEGRATED ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATIONS | [2000/26] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION DE COURRIER ELECTRONIQUE POUR COMMUNICATIONS ELECTRONIQUES INTEGREES | [2000/26] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/26] | 18.06.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.04.2009 | BE | 08.04.2009 | CY | 08.04.2009 | DK | 08.04.2009 | FI | 08.04.2009 | IT | 08.04.2009 | NL | 08.04.2009 | IE | 17.06.2009 | LU | 17.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | SE | 08.07.2009 | GR | 09.07.2009 | ES | 19.07.2009 | PT | 08.09.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
IT | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
LU | 17.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
GR | 09.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
IE | 17.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
BE | 08.04.2009 | ||
DK | 08.04.2009 | ||
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 08.04.2009 | |
FI | 08.04.2009 | ||
NL | 08.04.2009 | ||
SE | 08.07.2009 | ||
ES | 19.07.2009 | ||
PT | 08.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0565850 (IBM [US]) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * * page 14, line 54 - page 15, line 15 * * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 28 * [A] 1-6,9-12; | [XA]WO9636142 (COMPUSERVE INC [US]) [X] 1-6,9-12 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - page 3, line 9 * * claims 1,2,5,6 * [A] 7,8; | [A]WO9635994 (COMPUSERVE INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 3 * * page 3, line 8 - line 21 * * page 5, line 14 - line 22 ** page 6, line 15 - line 21 *; | [XY] - ROBROCK R B II, "The many faces of the LIDB data base", DISCOVERING A NEW WORLD OF COMMUNICATIONS. CHICAGO, JUNE 14 - 18, 1992. BOUND TOGETHER WITH B0190700, VOL. 3, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19920614), vol. 4, ISBN 0-7803-0599-X, pages 1903 - 1907, XP010061841 [X] 1-6,9-12 * page 1906; figure 7 * [Y] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.1992.267941 | International search | [XP]US5758088 (BEZAIRE DAVID L [US], et al) |