EP0925051 - FLEXIBLE APPLICATOR FOR VAGINALLY OR RECTALLY INSERTING AN ARTICLE, LIKE A CATAMENIAL TAMPON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/26] | FLEXIBLE APPLICATOR FOR INSERTING AN ARTICLE INTO A MAMMALIAN BODY CAVITY | ||
[2003/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McNeil-PPC, Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman New Jersey 08558 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | For all designated states McNEIL-PPC, Inc. 199 Grandview Road Skillman, New Jersey 08558 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLE, Robert, T. 81 Rita Lane Jackson, NJ 08527 / US | 02 /
HAGERTY, Andrew, J. 4521 Deep Creek Way Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | [1999/26] | Representative(s) | Groening, Hans Wilhelm Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Groening, Hans Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98930348.2 | 17.06.1998 | [1999/26] | WO1998US12658 | Priority number, date | US19970885719 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 885719 | [1999/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900097 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0925051 | Date: | 30.06.1999 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0925051 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/26 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
A61F13/26 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1013 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1036 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IT, NL [1999/26] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLER APPLIKATOR ZUM VAGINALEN ODER REKTALEN EINFÜHREN EINES ARTIKELS, WIE EINES TAMPONS | [2003/09] | English: | FLEXIBLE APPLICATOR FOR VAGINALLY OR RECTALLY INSERTING AN ARTICLE, LIKE A CATAMENIAL TAMPON | [2003/09] | French: | APPLICATEUR SOUPLE POUR INSERTION VAGINALE OU RECTALE D'UN ARTICLE, COMME UN TAMPON | [2003/09] |
Former [1999/26] | FLEXIBLER APPLIKATOR ZUM EINFÜHREN EINES ARTIKELS IN EINE KÖRPERHÖHLE EINES SÄUGERS | ||
Former [1999/26] | FLEXIBLE APPLICATOR FOR INSERTING AN ARTICLE INTO A MAMMALIAN BODY CAVITY | ||
Former [1999/26] | APPLICATEUR SOUPLE POUR INSERTION D'UN ARTICLE DANS UNE CAVITE ANATOMIQUE DE MAMMIFERE | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 07.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2101461 (TAMPAX INC); | [A]US4318404 (CUNNINGHAM THOMAS W) [A] 1,22 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0613672 (TAMBRANDS INC [US]) [Y] 3-7,14,23,26,29,30 * abstract *; | [A]US5395308 (FOX DONALD G [US], et al); | [XY]US5409469 (SCHAERF RAYMOND [US]) [X] 1,2,8,12,17,20,22,25,27,39 * abstract * [Y] 3-7,14,23,26,29,30; | [A]WO9637173 (PLAYTEX PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1,22 * abstract * | by applicant | US4508531 | US4755164 | US5158535 | US5267953 | EP0606923 | US5437628 |