EP0996546 - TRANSPARENT PRINTING BLANKETS AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.2004 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyfibron Technologies, Inc. 5210 Phillip Lee Drive Atlanta Georgia 30336-2293 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Polyfibron Technologies, Inc. 5210 Phillip Lee Drive Atlanta, Georgia 30336-2293 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGNEW, Brooks, A. 5640 Sussex Lane Morristown, TN 37814 / US | 02 /
GAERTNER, Roland 10, rue des Jonquilles F-68400 Riedishein / FR | 03 /
NABET, Peter 31 Prescott Drive N. Chelmsford, MA 01863 / US | [2000/18] | Representative(s) | WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Eastcheap House Central Approach Letchworth, Hertfordshire SG6 3DS / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930357.3 | 17.06.1998 | [2000/18] | WO1998US12675 | Priority number, date | US19970886224 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: US 886224 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901289 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996546 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996546 | Date: | 22.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.01.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41L3/02, B41N10/00, B41C1/18 | [2000/40] | CPC: |
B41N10/04 (EP,US);
B41N2210/02 (EP,US);
B41N2210/04 (EP,US);
B41N2210/06 (EP,US);
B41N2210/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/18] | B41L3/02, B41N6/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | TRANSPARANTES GUMMITUCH UND VERFAHREN ZUM GEBRAUCH | [2000/18] | English: | TRANSPARENT PRINTING BLANKETS AND METHODS OF USE | [2000/18] | French: | BLANCHETS D'IMPRIMERIE TRANSPARENTS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2000/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 24.12.1999 | Search fee paid | 24.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 25.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.10.2003 | BE | 22.10.2003 | CH | 22.10.2003 | CY | 22.10.2003 | FI | 22.10.2003 | LI | 22.10.2003 | NL | 22.10.2003 | DK | 22.01.2004 | GR | 22.01.2004 | SE | 22.01.2004 | PT | 22.03.2004 | IE | 17.06.2004 | LU | 17.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
CY | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
IE | 17.06.2004 | ||
LU | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
IE | 17.06.2004 | ||
LU | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
LU | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
BE | 22.10.2003 | ||
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
DK | 22.01.2004 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
CH | 22.10.2003 | ||
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
LI | 22.10.2003 | ||
NL | 22.10.2003 | ||
GR | 22.01.2004 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 22.10.2003 | |
FI | 22.10.2003 | ||
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 22.10.2003 | |
SE | 22.01.2004 | ||
Former [2004/24] | SE | 22.01.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0222680 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-28 * page 1, line 7 - line 10 * * page 8, line 50 - line 55 ** page 11, line 16 - line 17 * | International search | [A]US4135960 (SHUPPERT LAURENCE V, et al); | [A]US5264289 (KONDO YASUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]US5410963 (STEADMAN GLYNN R [US]) |