EP1001743 - IMPLANTS FOR CONTROLLED RELEASE OF PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE PRINCIPLES AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.12.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEBIO RECHERCHE PHARMACEUTIQUE S.A. Case postale 368, Route du Levant 146 CH-1920 Martigny / CH | [2006/05] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states DEBIO RECHERCHE PHARMACEUTIQUE S.A. Case postale 368, Route du Levant 146 CH-1920 Martigny / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTHEN-WEINHOLD, Alexandra 1, rue de la Débridée CH-1227 Carouge / CH | 02 /
GURNY, Robert 7, rue de Calvin CH-1204 Genève / CH | 03 /
ORSOLINI, Piero 11, rue de l'Hôpital CH-1920 Martigny / CH | 04 /
HEIMGARTNER, Frédéric 9, route de la Rivaz CH-1844 Villeneuve / CH | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Nargolwalla, Cyra Cabinet Plasseraud 84, rue d'Amsterdam 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98930779.8 | 02.06.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998EP03270 | Priority number, date | FR19970006874 | 04.06.1997 Original published format: FR 9706874 | [2000/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855101 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001743 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001743 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
A61K9/0092 (EP,US);
A61K9/0024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | IMPLANTATE ZUR GESTEUERTEN FREISETZUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN WIRKSTOFFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2005/26] | English: | IMPLANTS FOR CONTROLLED RELEASE OF PHARMACEUTICALLY ACTIVE PRINCIPLES AND METHOD FOR MAKING SAME | [2000/21] | French: | IMPLANTS POUR LA LIBERATION CONTROLEE DE PRINCIPES PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACTIFS ET PROCEDE POUR LEUR FABRICATION | [2000/21] |
Former [2000/21] | IMPLANTATE ZUR GESTEUERTEN FREISETZUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHE WIRKSTOFFEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 05.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.02.2006 | FI | 01.02.2006 | GB | 01.02.2006 | IE | 01.02.2006 | IT | 01.02.2006 | NL | 01.02.2006 | DK | 01.05.2006 | SE | 01.05.2006 | GR | 02.05.2006 | DE | 03.05.2006 | ES | 12.05.2006 | LU | 02.06.2006 | BE | 30.06.2006 | CH | 30.06.2006 | FR | 30.06.2006 | LI | 30.06.2006 | PT | 03.07.2006 | [2008/36] |
Former [2008/23] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
GB | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
FR | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
GB | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
GR | 02.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2008/16] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
GB | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
IT | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
GB | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
CH | 30.06.2006 | ||
LI | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
GB | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
BE | 30.06.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
GB | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
DE | 03.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
PT | 03.07.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
DK | 01.05.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
IE | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
NL | 01.02.2006 | ||
SE | 01.05.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.02.2006 | |
FI | 01.02.2006 | ||
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.02.2006 | |
ES | 12.05.2006 | ||
Former [2006/34] | ES | 12.05.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9111176 (AKZO NV [NL]) [X] 1-4,6-8,12 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9214450 (UNIV KENTUCKY RES FOUND [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,12 * the whole document *; | [T] - A. ROTHEN-WEINHOLD, "Development of a long-term delivery system for RC-160, a somatostatin analog", THE 24TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CONTROLLED RELEASE OF BIOACTIVE MATERIALS, STOCKHOLM (SE), (19970615), vol. 24, pages 827 - 828, XP002055081 [T] 1,9 * the whole document * |