EP0986749 - METHOD FOR SEPARATING A FLUID SUBSTANCE AND DEVICE THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2005 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VRIJE UNIVERSITEIT BRUSSEL R&D-IR Department, Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | [2000/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARON, Gino Bleuckveldlaan 34 B-3080 Tervuren / BE | 02 /
DESMET, Gert Tervuursesteenweg 720 B-1982 Elewijt / BE | [2000/12] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2002/28] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, P.O. Box 18558 2502 EN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2000/12] | Hoorweg, Petrus Nicolaas Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 98930794.7 | 03.06.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998EP03485 | Priority number, date | EP19970201699 | 04.06.1997 Original published format: EP 97201699 | [2000/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9855858 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0986749 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0986749 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/38, F04B43/04 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
G01N30/38 (EP,US);
F04B43/043 (EP,US);
F04B43/14 (EP,US);
G01N2030/326 (EP,US);
G01N30/58 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25375 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
G01N30/58, B01D2215/022 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG EINER FLUIDEN SUBSTANZ UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2000/12] | English: | METHOD FOR SEPARATING A FLUID SUBSTANCE AND DEVICE THEREFOR | [2000/12] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE SEPARER UNE SUBSTANCE FLUIDE ET DISPOSITIF CONNEXE | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 31.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.08.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3417548 (THOMPSON DONALD W) [A] 1,13; | [A]US3511028 (SAYLOR CHARLES PROFFER) [A] 1,13; | [A]GB1242255 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB])[A] 1,13; | [Y]US4839032 (WHITLOCK DAVID R [US]) [Y] 1,5-14 * paragraph [000L]; figure 13 *; | [Y]US4874507 (WHITLOCK DAVID R [US]) [Y] 1,5-14 * column 2, line 65 - column 3, line 4 * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 26 * * column 8, lines 6-49; figure 4 * * column 10, lines 41-57; figure 5 * * column 11, lines 7-46; figure 6 * * column 12, lines 19-41 *; | [A]DE4108820 (REUTER KARL DR [DE]) [A] 1,13 * column 5, lines 35-66 * * column 6, lines 11-18 *; | [DA]EP0670489 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [DA] 2,13 * abstract * |