EP0990224 - GENERATING AN IMAGE OF A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 21.01.2004 [2004/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTLOCK, Andrew, Nicholas 32 Hatfield Road,Ipswich Suffolk IP3 9AF / GB | 02 /
SHEPPARD, Philip, Julian 72 Bucklesham Road,Ipswich Suffolk IP3 8TP / GB | 03 /
WALLIN, Nicholas, James 48 Treherne Court,Tooting Bec London SW17 8BJ / GB | [2000/14] | Representative(s) | Lloyd, Barry George William, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department - PP C5A BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/14] | Lloyd, Barry George William, et al BT Group Legal Services, Intellectual Property Department, 8th Floor, Holborn Centre, 120 Holborn London EC1N 2TE / GB | Application number, filing date | 98930876.2 | 17.06.1998 | [2000/14] | WO1998GB01772 | Priority number, date | EP19970304217 | 17.06.1997 Original published format: EP 97304217 | [2000/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858351 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0990224 | Date: | 05.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0990224 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/10 | [2000/14] | CPC: |
G06T17/10 (EP,US);
G06T15/04 (EP,US);
G06T15/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2000/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ZEICHNEN VON BILDERN DREIDIMENSIONALER OJEKTE | [2000/14] | English: | GENERATING AN IMAGE OF A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT | [2000/14] | French: | GENERATION D'UNE IMAGE D'UN OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2000/14] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 06.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.08.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.05.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.2003 | [2004/04] | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0454129 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1 * claim 1 *; | [A]GB2287387 (VIRTUALITY [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 20 * * page 5, line 34 - page 11, line 5 *; | [A]EP0758118 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1* claim 7 * |