EP0988158 - HIGH PERFORMANCE BROAD APPLICATION WHEEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nimble Bicycle Company 6405 Culpepper Cove Austin, TX 78730 / US | [2000/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUTTGEHARM, Clint 1105 Coachhouse Circle Wichita, KS 67235 / US | 02 /
NAYER, David 6405 Culpepper Cove Austin, TX 78730 / US | [2000/13] | Representative(s) | Eder, Thomas, et al Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/13] | Eder, Thomas (DE), et al Eder & Schieschke Patentanwälte, Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98931309.3 | 17.06.1998 | [2000/13] | WO1998US12534 | Priority number, date | US19970878392 | 18.06.1997 Original published format: US 878392 | [2000/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9857812 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0988158 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0988158 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP0988158 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.12.1998 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60B5/02, B60B1/00, B60B21/06 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
B60B1/06 (EP,US);
B60B1/003 (EP,US);
B60B21/02 (EP,US);
B60B21/025 (EP,US);
B60B21/062 (EP,US);
B60B21/08 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/13] | B60B5/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/13] | Title | German: | HOCHLEISTUNGSRAD MIT WEITEM ANWENDUNGSGEBIET | [2000/13] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE BROAD APPLICATION WHEEL | [2000/13] | French: | ROUE HAUTES PERFORMANCES A LARGE CHAMP D'APPLICATION | [2000/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 18.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 18.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.01.2000 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 | 19.01.2000 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   01.02.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.03.2004 | BE | 17.03.2004 | CH | 17.03.2004 | CY | 17.03.2004 | ES | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | IT | 17.03.2004 | LI | 17.03.2004 | NL | 17.03.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | IE | 17.06.2004 | LU | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | PT | 17.08.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
CY | 17.03.2004 | ||
ES | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
IE | 17.06.2004 | ||
LU | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
NL | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
IE | 17.06.2004 | ||
LU | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
IE | 17.06.2004 | ||
LU | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
LU | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
BE | 17.03.2004 | ||
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
CH | 17.03.2004 | ||
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
LI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 17.03.2004 | |
FI | 17.03.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4995675 (TSAI CARLOS [TW]) [XD] 1,5-7,16,17,19 * column 2, line 13 - line 67; figure - *; | [XD]US5246275 (ARREDONDO JR RENE N [US]) [XD] 7-9* column 21, line 26 - line 61; figure - * | International search | [X]US4995765 (TOKUHIRO TOMOYA [JP], et al); | [X]US5246575 (ALEXANDER RICHARD A [US]); | [X]US5540485 (ENDERS MARK L [US]) |