EP1016134 - PLASMA REACTOR FOR PASSIVATING A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Change - representative | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION 4650 Cushing Parkway Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2000/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Changhun 10100 Torre Avenue, #127 Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
SINGH, Vikram 530 Mission Court 110 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | 03 /
YANG, Yun-Yen, Jack 4378 Silver Berry Drive San Jose, CA 95136 / US | [2000/35] |
Former [2000/27] | 01 /
LEE, Changhun 37139 Denning Terrace 197 Fremont, CA 94536 / US | ||
02 /
SINGH, Vikram 530 Mission Court 110 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | |||
03 /
YANG, Yun-Yen, Jack 4378 Silver Berry Drive San Jose, CA 95136 / US | Representative(s) | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Hepworth Browne 15 St Paul's Street Leeds LS1 2JG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB | ||
Former [2006/50] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al Leaman Browne 5 South Parade Leeds, LS1 5QX / GB | ||
Former [2006/31] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, et al HLBBshaw 1200 Century Way Thorpe Park Business Park, Colton Leeds LS15 8ZA / GB | ||
Former [2000/27] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA West Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 98931533.8 | 24.06.1998 | [2000/27] | WO1998US13081 | Priority number, date | US19970882222 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: US 882222 | [2000/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9859367 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1016134 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1016134 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/3213, H01J37/32 | [2000/27] | CPC: |
H01L21/02071 (EP,US);
H01L21/3213 (KR);
H01J37/32633 (EP,US);
H01L21/31138 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, IE, IT, NL [2000/27] | Title | German: | PLASMAREAKTOR FÜR DIE PASSIVIERUNG EINES SUBSTRATES | [2000/27] | English: | PLASMA REACTOR FOR PASSIVATING A SUBSTRATE | [2000/27] | French: | REACTEUR A PLASMA PERMETTANT DE PASSIVER UN SUBSTRAT | [2000/27] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 20.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 31.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 25.04.2003 | Appeal received No. T0761/03 | 09.06.2003 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.12.2004 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 06.12.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Opposition(s) | 09.11.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.02.2006 | [2006/43] | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0831803 ; | [A]US4534816 (CHEN LEE [US], et al) [A] 1,11,20,23 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4836902 (KALNITSKY ALEXANDER [CA], et al) [A] 1,11,20,23 * the whole document *; | [A]US5545289 (CHEN JIAN [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 096, no. 006, & JP08031803 A 19960202 (PLASMA SYST:KK) [A] 1,3,5,11,13,14,20,23,25 * abstract * | [A] - SINGH V ET AL, "Application of plasma and flow modeling to the design of optimized aluminum equipment", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, XP002079763 [A] * abstract * | [ ] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PROCESS CONTROL, DIAGNOSTICS, AND MODELING IN SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACTURING, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PROCESS CONTROL, DIAGNOSTICS, AND MODELLING IN SEMICONDUCTOR MANUFACT, ISBN 1-56677-136-6, 1997, Pennington, NJ, USA, Electrochem. Soc, USA, pages 251 - 259 |