EP1002142 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING DEPOSITION OF CONTAMINANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states Applied Materials, Inc. 3050 Bowers Avenue Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHITE, Anthony, F. 20061 Forest Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
KUPPURAO, Satheesh 3131 Homestead Road 14-E Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 03 /
HAAS, Brian, L. 5363 Joseph Lane San Jose, CA 95118 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 98931674.0 | 26.06.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998US13394 | Priority number, date | US19970884192 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 884192 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9900531 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002142 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1002142 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/44 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
C23C16/45504 (EP,US);
C23C16/44 (KR);
C23C16/4401 (EP,US);
C23C16/4408 (EP,US);
C23C16/45508 (EP,US);
C23C16/45519 (EP,US);
C23C16/4586 (EP,US);
C23C16/46 (EP,US);
C23C16/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/21] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON VERUNREINIGUNGEN | [2000/21] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR REDUCING DEPOSITION OF CONTAMINANTS | [2000/21] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LES DEPOTS DE CONTAMINANTS | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 24.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.12.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]JPH01312078 ; | [X]JPS5958326 ; | [X]US5062386 (CHRISTENSEN ROBERT W [US]) [X] 1,2,9,15,16 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 4 * * column 9, line 60 - line 65 *; | [X]US5574247 (NISHITANI EISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,9 * column 9, line 35 - line 61; figures 32-34 *; | [Y]FR1553985 (H.MAHLO) [Y] 9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9637763 (MATTSON TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 27, line 1 - line 31 * * page 29, line 28 - line 30 *; | [PX]EP0825279 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [PX] 1,2 * column 8, line 37 - column 11, line 12; figure 4 * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900228), vol. 014, no. 109, Database accession no. (C - 0695), & JP01312078 A 19891215 (BABCOCK HITACHI KK) [X] 1-3,5-7,14-16 * abstract * [Y] 9,10 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840724), vol. 008, no. 159, Database accession no. (P - 289), & JP59058326 A 19840404 (FUJITSU KK) [X] 1,2,6,7,9,12 * abstract * |