EP1017874 - COLORLESS DIAMOND-LIKE CARBON COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2002 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COATES, Don, Mayo 34 West Wildflower Drive Santa Fe, NM 87501 / US | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Jones, Alan John CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London, WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98931739.1 | 30.06.1998 | [2000/28] | WO1998US13603 | Priority number, date | US19970051372P | 01.07.1997 Original published format: US 51372 P | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901589 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1017874 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1017874 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/26 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
C23C16/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/28] | Title | German: | FARBLOSE DIAMANTÄHNLICHE KOHLENSTOFFBESCHICHTUNGEN | [2002/06] | English: | COLORLESS DIAMOND-LIKE CARBON COATINGS | [2000/28] | French: | REVETEMENTS EN CARBONE SEMBLABLE A DU DIAMANT NON COLORE | [2000/28] |
Former [2000/28] | FARBLOSE DIAMANDÄHNLICHE KOHLENSTOFFBESCHICHTUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 29.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5145711 (YAMAZAKI SHUNPEI ET AL) [X] 7 * column 4, line 52 - column 5, line 2; figures 2,6 * [A] 1; | [A]US4783361 (OVSHINSKY STANFORD R ET AL) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 34-40 *; | [A]EP0454995 (XEROX CORP) [A] 1 * column 7, lines 3-25 *; | [A]EP0676484 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 3-34 *; | [A]EP0668372 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] 1 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 4 * |