EP0996696 - GRINDING MEDIA CONSISTING ESSENTIALLY OF SINTERED TiO 2 PARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/18] | GRINDING MEDIA CONSISTING ESSENTIALLY OF SINTERED TiO 2? PARTICLES | ||
[2002/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2003 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Qian, Qiu 101 Cambridge Road Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 02 /
ZIMMERMAN, David, Allen 15 Pheasant's Ridge North Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | [2000/19] |
Former [2000/18] | 01 /
ZHAO, Qian, Qiu 121 Cambridge Road Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | ||
02 /
ZIMMERMAN, David, Allen 15 Pheasant's Ridge North Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98931740.9 | 30.06.1998 | [2000/18] | WO1998US13604 | Priority number, date | US19970887552 | 03.07.1997 Original published format: US 887552 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9901521 | Date: | 14.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996696 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996696 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/14, C09C1/36, C04B35/46, C04B35/628, C01G23/08 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
C04B35/46 (EP,US);
C01G23/08 (EP,US);
C09C1/3692 (EP,US);
C09K3/1409 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/51 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/18] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFMITTEL IM WESENTLICHEN AUS GESINTERTEM TITANOXID | [2002/19] | English: | GRINDING MEDIA CONSISTING ESSENTIALLY OF SINTERED TiO 2 PARTICLES | [2002/19] | French: | AGENTS DE BROYAGE CONSTITUES PRINCIPALEMENT DE PARTICULES DE TiO 2 FRITTEES | [2002/19] |
Former [2000/18] | SCHLEIFMITTEL IM WESENTLICHEN AUS GESINTERTE TITANOXID | ||
Former [2000/18] | GRINDING MEDIA CONSISTING ESSENTIALLY OF SINTERED TiO 2? PARTICLES | ||
Former [2000/18] | AGENTS DE BROYAGE CONSTITUES PRINCIPALEMENT DE PARTICULES DE TiO 2? FRITTEES | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 06.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 04.12.2002 | IT | 04.12.2002 | NL | 04.12.2002 | ES | 27.06.2003 | [2008/16] |
Former [2004/04] | FI | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
ES | 27.06.2003 | ||
Former [2003/43] | FI | 04.12.2002 | |
NL | 04.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | NL | 04.12.2002 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9507237 (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0469730 (TIOXIDE GROUP SERVICES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2721626 (RICK CHRISTIAN E) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4784841 (HARTMANN ACHIM [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1024053 (BRITISH TITAN PRODUCTS) [A] 1-15 * page 3, column 2, line 80 - line 90 * |