EP1100570 - APPARATUS FOR AND METHODS OF ADMINISTERING VOLATILE SUBSTANCES INTO AN INHALATION FLOW PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reed, F. Dewitt, Jr. 7816 Silver Plateau Avenue Las Vegas, NV 89128 / US | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states Reed, F. Dewitt, Jr. 8395 Stoney Mountain Way Flagstaff, AZ 86001 / US | ||
Former [2001/21] | For all designated states Reed, F. Dewitt, Jr. 62 Macon Avenue Asheville, NC 28801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/21] | Representative(s) | Powell, Timothy John, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/21] | Powell, Timothy John, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98931808.4 | 01.07.1998 | [2001/21] | WO1998US14092 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0001437 | Date: | 13.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1100570 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1100570 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.01.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00, A61M15/08 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
A61M15/00 (KR);
A61M15/08 (EP);
A61M15/085 (EP);
A61M11/04 (EP);
A61M2021/0016 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2001/21] | A61M15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/21] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON FLÜCHTIGEN WIRKSTOFFEN IN EINEM INHALATIONSSTRÖMUNGSWEG | [2001/21] | English: | APPARATUS FOR AND METHODS OF ADMINISTERING VOLATILE SUBSTANCES INTO AN INHALATION FLOW PATH | [2001/21] | French: | APPAREIL ET TECHNIQUES PERMETTANT D'INTRODUIRE DES SUBSTANCES VOLATILES DANS UN FLUX D'INHALATION | [2001/21] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2001 | Search fee paid | 01.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 01.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/21] | 03.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | LU | 01.07.2006 | IE | 03.07.2006 | MC | 31.07.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LU | 01.07.2006 | ||
IE | 03.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 03.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 03.07.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 31.07.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4955945 (WEICK HEINZ H [CH]) [X] 11-15 * column 4, line 22 - line 51; figures 3,4 *; | [X]CH304190 (MUHLETHALER ERNEST FREDERIC [CH]) [X] 11,12,15-20 * page 2, line 22 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [X]GB520491 (OTTO TRAVERS TAUSS, et al) [X] 11-13,15-20 * page 2, lines 39-71; figure 1 *; | [X]USRE35408E (PETRUSON BJOERN [SE]) [X] 11,15-20 * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 8; figures 4-11 *; | [X]US2426161 (BIEDERMAN JOSEPH B) [X] 11,12,15-20 * column 2, line 42 - column 3, line 6; figure 4 *; | [E]EP0906765 (OREAL [FR]) [E] 11,12,15-20 * paragraphs [0030] - [0032]; figure - *; | [A]US4285468 (HYMAN SY) [A] 14 * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 59; figure 3 * | International search | [X]US5706800 (CRONK PETER J [US], et al); | [Y]US4899739 (KONISHI RYUSAKU [JP]); | [Y]US888869 (CLARK FRANK I [US]) |