EP0980311 - INKING SYSTEM FOR INKING A FORM CYLINDER OF A PRINTING MACHINE BY INTAGLIO ENGRAVING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | For all designated states U.E. SEBALD DRUCK UND VERLAG GmbH Äusserer Laufer Platz 22 90403 Nürnberg / DE | [2000/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRISTMANN, Dieter Äusserer Laufer Platz 12 D-90403 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
DRUMM, Hans-Dieter Höhweg 31 D-66887 Rammelsbach / DE | 03 /
HERB, Rudolf Richard-Wagner-Strasse 17 D-67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | 04 /
STRAUBINGER, Werner, Georg, Roman Böcklerstrasse 11 D-90480 Nürnberg / DE | [2001/44] |
Former [2000/08] | 01 /
CHRISTMANN, Dieter Äu erer Laufer Platz 12 D-90403 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02 /
DRUMM, Hans-Dieter Höhweg 31 D-66887 Rammelsbach / DE | |||
03 /
HERB, Rudolf Richard-Wagner-Strasse 17 D-67240 Bobenheim-Roxheim / DE | |||
04 /
STRAUBINGER, Werner, Georg, Roman Böcklerstrasse 11 D-90480 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98932044.5 | 02.05.1998 | [2000/08] | WO1998DE01212 | Priority number, date | DE1997118587 | 05.05.1997 Original published format: DE 19718587 | [2000/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9850233 | Date: | 12.11.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0980311 | Date: | 23.02.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0980311 | Date: | 07.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41F9/06 | [2000/08] | CPC: |
B41F9/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/08] | Title | German: | FARBWERK ZUM EINFÄRBEN EINES FORMZYLINDERS EINER TIEFDRUCKMASCHINE | [2000/08] | English: | INKING SYSTEM FOR INKING A FORM CYLINDER OF A PRINTING MACHINE BY INTAGLIO ENGRAVING | [2000/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENCRAGE POUR L'ENCRAGE D'UN CYLINDRE GRAVE D'UNE PRESSE DE ROTOGRAVURE | [2000/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/08] | 03.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE604870 (LINOTYPE MACHINERY LTD) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]US1633691 (BRUESHABER MARTIN W) [A] 1,2,8 * page 2, line 70 - line 99; figures 2,4 *; | [A]GB383135 (MARIO MENAGLIA) [A] 6 * figure 1 * |