EP0985302 - NON-COHERENT SEQUENCE ESTIMATION RECEIVER FOR DIGITAL MODULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli 10 20126 Milano / IT | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/14] | For all designated states Siemens Mobile Communications S.p.A. Viale Piero e Alberto Pirelli, 10 20126 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2000/11] | For all designated states Italtel - A Stet and Siemens Company S.p.A. Piazzale Zavattari, 12 20149 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHELI, Riccardo Borgo San Silvestro, 36 I-43100 Parma / IT | 02 /
COLAVOLPE, Giulio Via Dogana, 217 I-87032 Amantea / IT | [2000/11] | Representative(s) | Giustini, Delio Siemens Information and Communication Networks S.p.A. Via Monfalcone 1 Palazzo Gorky 20092 Cinisello Balsamo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Giustini, Delio Siemens Information and Communication Networks S.p.A. Palazzo Gorky Via Monfalcone, 1 20092 Cinisello Balsamo / IT | ||
Former [2000/11] | Giustini, Delio, et al c/o Siemens Information and Communication Networks S.p.A., Cascina Castelletto 20019 Settimo Milanese / IT | Application number, filing date | 98932145.0 | 03.06.1998 | [2000/11] | WO1998EP03486 | Priority number, date | IT1997MI01301 | 03.06.1997 Original published format: IT MI971301 | [2000/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9856119 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0985302 | Date: | 15.03.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0985302 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [2000/11] | CPC: |
H04L25/03184 (EP,US);
H04B7/005 (EP,US);
H04L25/03337 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/11] | Title | German: | NICHTKOHÄRENTE FOLGESCHÄTZUNGSEMPFÄNGER FÜR DIGITALEN MODULATIONEN | [2000/11] | English: | NON-COHERENT SEQUENCE ESTIMATION RECEIVER FOR DIGITAL MODULATIONS | [2000/11] | French: | RECEPTEUR NON COHERENT D'ESTIMATION DE SEQUENCE DE SYMBOLES UTILISE EN CAS DE MODULATIONS NUMERIQUES | [2000/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 30.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04030138.4 / EP1531572 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.08.2005 | FR | 17.08.2005 | SE | 17.11.2005 | [2009/01] |
Former [2006/13] | FI | 17.08.2005 | |
SE | 17.11.2005 | Cited in | International search | [A] - D'ANDREA A N ET AL, "APPROXIMATE ML DECODING OF CODED PSK WITH NO EXPLICIT CARRIER PHASE REFERENCE", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19940201), vol. 42, no. 2/3/4, pages 1033 - 1039, XP000447352 [A] 1-25 * see sections II, III, IV-D * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOMM.1994.580211 | [AD] - RAPHAELI D, "NONCOHERENT CODED MODULATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19960201), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 172 - 183, XP000554667 [AD] 1-25 * see section II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.486610 | [AD] - P. Y. KAM ET AL, "A Viterbi-type algorithm for efficient estimation of M-PSK sequences over the Gaussian channel with unknown carrier phase", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, USA, ISSN 0090-6778, (199509), vol. 43, no. 9, pages 2429 - 2433, XP002089277 [AD] 1-25 * see section II-B * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.412716 | [AD] - RAHELI R ET AL, "PER-SURVIVOR PROCESSING: A GENERAL APPROACH TO MLSE IN UNCERTAIN ENVIRONMENTS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, (19950202), vol. 43, no. 2/03/04, pages 354 - 360, XP002059868 [AD] 1-25 * see sections III, IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.380054 | [XP] - COLAVOLPE G ET AL, "NON-COHERENT SEQUENCE DETECTION OF M-ARY PSK", 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, MONTREAL, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, (19970608), vol. 1, pages 21 - 25, XP000740196 [XP] 1-4 * see sections 2.1, 2.2, 2.3 * | [XP] - COLAVOLPE G ET AL, "Non-coherent sequence detection of QAM", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INFORMATION THEORY, ULM, GERMANY, ISBN 0-7803-3956-8, 1997, IEEE, New York, NY, USA, (19970629), page 536, XP002089321 [XP] 1,2 * see section II * |