EP0995348 - CLAMPING DEVICE, TOOL AND METHOD OF MOUNTING TOOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.09.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2003 [2003/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FICO B.V. Ratio 6 6921 RW Duiven / NL | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DALEN, Adrianus, Wilhelmus Zwanenveld 25-09 NL-6538 NG Nijmegen / NL | 02 /
DE BOER, Willem, Adriaan Ds. J.A. Visserstraat 56 NL-6988 AC Lathum / NL | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/09] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 NL-5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | ||
Former [2000/17] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Octrooibureau LIOC B.V., P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 98932635.0 | 09.07.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998NL00397 | Priority number, date | NL19971006562 | 11.07.1997 Original published format: NL 1006562 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903318 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0995348 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0995348 | Date: | 20.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
H05K13/0092 (EP,US);
H05K13/00 (KR);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2000/17] | Title | German: | SPANNVORRICHTUNG, WERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON WERKZEUGEN | [2001/27] | English: | CLAMPING DEVICE, TOOL AND METHOD OF MOUNTING TOOLS | [2000/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE, OUTIL ET PROCEDE DE MONTAGE D'OUTILS | [2000/17] |
Former [2000/17] | SPANNVORRICHTUNG, WERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG VON WERKZEUGE | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05159991 ; | [A]GB2262057 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [A] 1,2* abstract *; | [X]US5301720 (PLUMMER JR LAWRENCE L [HK], et al) [X] 1,2,10,13-15 * column 5, line 5 - column 5, line 20; figure 6 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931006), vol. 17, no. 556, Database accession no. (E - 1444), & JP05159991 A 19930625 (MURATA MFG CO LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |