EP0991798 - MELT SPUN FLUOROPOLYMERIC FIBERS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/35] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | ||
Former [2000/15] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEFFNER, Glenn, William 10 Breeze Hill Road Centerville, DE 19807 / US | 02 /
UY, William, Cheng 621 Parkridge Drive Hockessin, DE 19707 / US | 03 /
WAGNER, Martin, Gerald 1013 Overlook Road Wilmington, DE 19807 / US | [2000/15] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/15] | Matthews, Derek Peter, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98932771.3 | 16.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998US12606 | Priority number, date | US19970050220P | 19.06.1997 Original published format: US 50220 P | [2000/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858105 | Date: | 23.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991798 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0991798 | Date: | 28.08.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/32 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
D01F6/32 (EP,US);
D01F6/42 (KR);
Y10T428/2913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2967 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | SCHMELZGESPONNENE FASERN AUS FLUOROPOLYMEREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2000/15] | English: | MELT SPUN FLUOROPOLYMERIC FIBERS AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THEM | [2000/15] | French: | FIBRES FLUOROPOLYMERES FILEES A CHAUD ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 25.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]JPS63219616 ; | [DA]US3770711 (HARTIG M, et al) [DA] 1-27 * column W *; | [DA]EP0595147 (AUSIMONT SPA [IT]) [DA] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [DA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 88, no. 42, Database accession no. 88-297850, XP002080878 & JPS63219616 A 19880913 (SHOWA KOGYO KK) [DA] * abstract * | [DA] - KRONFEL'D A M ET AL, "SOME ASPECTS OF SPINNING FIBRES FROM FLUORINE-CONTAINING COPOLYMERS BY MELT EXTRUSION", FIBRE CHEMISTRY, (198611), vol. 18, no. 2, pages 104 - 107, XP002080875 [DA] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00549623 | [A] - KRONFEL'D A M ET AL, "Preparation of fluorine-containing fibers F-50 by extrusion from a melt", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19820419), vol. 96, no. 16, Database accession no. 124367b, page 81, column 2, XP002080876 [A] 1-27 * abstract * | [D] - KHIM. VOLOKNA, USSR, (1982), vol. 1, pages 13 - 14 | [A] - KRONFEL'D A M ET AL, "Rheological characteristics and characteristics of the flow of a melt of fiber-forming Ftoroplast F-50", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19830307), vol. 98, no. 10, Database accession no. 73718y, page 68, column 1, XP002080877 [A] 1-27 * abstract * | [ ] - NOV. REOL. POLIM. MATER. VSES SIMP. REOL., USSR, (1982), vol. 1, pages 266 - 269 |