EP0998298 - METHOD OF AN INCREASING THE ANTIGEN PRESENTING ABILITY OF MONOCYTES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2010 [2010/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES The National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states THE GOVERNMENT OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, as represented by THE SECRETARY OF THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES National Institute of Health, Office of Technology Transfer, 6011 Executive Boulevard, Suite 325 Rockville, MD 20852-3804 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Peter 220 Kenton Road Chagrin Falls, OH 44022 / US | 02 /
CZERNIECKI, Brian, J. 77 Chews Landing Road Haddenfield, NJ 08033 / US | 03 /
KOSKI, Gary, K. Apartment 2 4918 Battery Lane Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 04 /
WENG, David, E. 9310 Adelaide Drive Bethesda, MD 20816 / US | 05 /
CARTER, Charles 25036 Woodfield School Road Gaithersberg, MD 20882 / US | 06 /
OJEIFO, John, O. 3106 Hillside Avenue Cheverlky, MD 20785 / US | 07 /
SCHWARTZ, Gretchen, N. 3106 Dawson Avenue Wheaton, MD 20902 / US | [2000/19] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/19] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98932972.7 | 30.06.1998 | [2000/19] | WO1998US13542 | Priority number, date | US19970885671 | 30.06.1997 Original published format: US 885671 | [2000/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9900137 | Date: | 07.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0998298 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K39/00, A61K35/14, C12N5/08 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
C12N5/0694 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/58 (EP,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP,US);
A61K39/4622 (EP,US);
A61K39/464493 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12N5/0639 (EP,US);
C12N5/0645 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C12N2500/14 (EP,US);
C12N2501/22 (EP,US);
C12N2501/23 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/19] | A61K38/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DER ANTIGEN-PRÄSENTIRUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN VON MONOCYTEN | [2009/39] | English: | METHOD OF AN INCREASING THE ANTIGEN PRESENTING ABILITY OF MONOCYTES | [2000/19] | French: | INDUCTION D'UN PHENOTYPE DE CELLULES DENDRITIQUES MYELOIDES ACTIVEES | [2000/19] |
Former [2000/19] | VERFAHREN ZUR ERHÖHUNG DEN ANTIGEN-PRÄSENTIRUNGSEIGENSCHAFTEN VON MONOCYTEN | Entry into regional phase | 28.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/19] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.07.2009 | 06.07.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 07.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.07.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/27] | 18.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9113632 (IMMUNE RESPONSE CORP INC [US]); | [A]WO9402156 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [X]WO9623060 (US HEALTH [US]); | [PX]WO9806823 (BAXTER INT [US]); | by applicant | WO9623060 |