EP1009303 - CIRCUMFERENTIAL ABLATION DEVICE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/25] | CIRCUMFERENTIAL ABLATION DEVICE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD | ||
[2006/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | For all designated states Atrionix, Inc. 1820 Embarcadero Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | For all designated states Emory University 1380 South Oxford Road, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
For all designated states Atrionix, Inc. 1820 Embarcadero Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
For all designated states EMORY UNIVERSITY 1380 South Oxford Road, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | |||
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 12th Floor, 1111 Franklin Street Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | ||
For all designated states Atrionix, Inc. 1820 Embarcadero Road Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | |||
For all designated states EMORY UNIVERSITY 1380 South Oxford Road Atlanta, GA 30322 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIEDERICH, Chris, J. 19 Nova Lane Novato, CA 94945 / US | 02 /
LESH, Michael, D. 301 Monte Vista Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US | 03 /
PEACOCK, James, C., III 410 Winding Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | 04 /
ROSS, Michael, Ronald 1415 Marlborough Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 05 /
LANGBERG, Jonathan, J. 664 Cresthill Avenue, N.E. Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col. P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Fiener, Josef Patentanw. J. Fiener et col., P.O. Box 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | ||
Former [2000/25] | Fiener, Josef Postfach 12 49 87712 Mindelheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 98933279.6 | 08.07.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US14220 | Priority number, date | US19970889835 | 08.07.1997 Original published format: US 889835 | US19980073527 | 03.02.1998 Original published format: US 73527 | US19980073477 | 03.02.1998 Original published format: US 73477 | US19970889798 | 08.07.1997 Original published format: US 889798 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902096 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009303 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1009303 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/04, A61N5/04, A61N7/02, A61B17/22 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
A61B18/10 (EP);
A61B18/1492 (EP);
A61M25/1002 (EP);
A61N7/02 (EP);
A61B18/08 (EP);
A61B18/18 (EP);
A61B18/1815 (EP);
A61B2017/22038 (EP);
A61B2018/00065 (EP);
A61B2018/00083 (EP);
A61B2018/00107 (EP);
A61B2018/00148 (EP);
A61B2018/00214 (EP);
A61B2018/0022 (EP);
A61B2018/00351 (EP);
A61B2018/00375 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/1407 (EP);
A61B5/363 (EP);
A61M2025/1047 (EP);
A61M2025/1052 (EP);
A61M2025/1068 (EP);
A61M2025/1075 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2000/25] | A61B17/39, A61N5/04, A61N7/02, A61B17/38 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZIRKUMFERENZIELLEN ABLATION | [2006/24] | English: | CIRCUMFERENTIAL ABLATION DEVICE ASSEMBLY | [2006/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ABLATION CIRCONFERENTIELLE | [2006/24] |
Former [2000/25] | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZIRKUMFERENZIELLEN ABLATION | ||
Former [2000/25] | CIRCUMFERENTIAL ABLATION DEVICE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD | ||
Former [2000/25] | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE D'ABLATION CIRCONFERENTIELLE | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 19.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.02.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/20] | Request for further processing for: | 14.06.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 31.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.06.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.06.2009 | BE | 10.06.2009 | CY | 10.06.2009 | FI | 10.06.2009 | IT | 10.06.2009 | GR | 11.09.2009 | ES | 21.09.2009 | PT | 10.10.2009 | [2011/45] |
Former [2011/25] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
IT | 10.06.2009 | ||
GR | 11.09.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
BE | 10.06.2009 | ||
FI | 10.06.2009 | ||
ES | 21.09.2009 | ||
PT | 10.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/05] | AT | 10.06.2009 | |
FI | 10.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0472368 (MED INST INC [US]) [X] 1,2,43 * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0711573 (DAIG CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 23, line 9 - column 24, line 16 * * column 29, line 22 - line 25 *; | [A]US5620479 (DIEDERICH CHRIS J [US]) [A] 1,47 * column 3, line 6 - line 21 * * column 12, line 47 - line 61 * * figures 1,9 *; | [AP]US5687723 (AVITALL BOAZ [US]) [AP] 1,2 * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 22 ** figures 16,17 * | by applicant | US4672962 | US4676258 | US4790311 | US4807620 | US4998933 | US5035694 | US5190540 | US5226430 |