EP1001796 - ANTACID AND PAPAIN COMBINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.08.2002 [2002/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEORGIADES, Constantine 6 Huron Court East Brunswick, NJ 08816 / US | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Mansmann, Ivo, et al Warner-Lambert Company Patent Department, c/o Gödeke AG Mooswaldallee 1-9 79090 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Mansmann, Ivo, et al Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Legal Department, c/o Gödecke AG 79090 Freiburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98933290.3 | 08.07.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998US14233 | Priority number, date | US19970052543P | 15.07.1997 Original published format: US 52543 P | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903486 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001796 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/78, A61K38/48, // (A61K38/48, 33:10), A61K33:08,(A61K35/78, 33:10), A61K33:08 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP);
A61K38/4873 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Y304/22002 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/4873, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Extension states | AL | 15.02.2000 | LT | 15.02.2000 | LV | 15.02.2000 | MK | 15.02.2000 | RO | 15.02.2000 | SI | 15.02.2000 | Title | German: | ANTAZIDUM UND PAPAIN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2000/21] | English: | ANTACID AND PAPAIN COMBINATION | [2000/21] | French: | COMBINAISON D'ANTIACIDE ET DE PAPAINE | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 01.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/32] | 07.03.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - RUHBACH W, "Klinische Erfahrungen mit Basofer", DTSCH MED J, NOV 5 1969, 20 (21) P660-2, GERMANY, WEST, XP002083165 [X] 1-22 * page 661, column 1, paragraph 3 * | [A] - CHO, CHI HIN ET AL, "Papain reduces gastric acid secretion induced by histamine and other secretagogues in anesthetized rats", PROC. NATL. SCI. COUNC., REPUB. CHINA, PART B, 1984, 8, 177-81, XP002083166 [A] 1-22 * abstract * |