EP0991356 - DEVICE FOR PROJECTION MAMMOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft Müllerstrasse 178, Postfach 65 03 11 13353 Berlin / DE | [2000/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPECK, Ulrich Fürstendamm 20 D-13465 Berlin / DE | 02 /
VON BRENNDORFF, Irtel Hohlbeinstrasse 1 D-38106 Braunschweig / DE | [2000/15] | Application number, filing date | 98933626.8 | 19.06.1998 | [2000/15] | WO1998EP03659 | Priority number, date | EP19970250190 | 20.06.1997 Original published format: EP 97250190 | [2000/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9858585 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0991356 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/00, G06T5/50, A61K49/04 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
A61K49/0409 (EP,US);
A61K49/04 (KR);
A61K49/0457 (EP,US);
A61P35/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/15] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR DIE PROJEKTIONSMAMMOGRAPHIE | [2000/15] | English: | DEVICE FOR PROJECTION MAMMOGRAPHY | [2000/15] | French: | DISPOSITIFS POUR LA MAMMOGRAPHIE AVEC PROJECTION | [2000/15] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/15] | 18.09.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4417628 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [X] - FLYNN M J ET AL, "Digital subtraction angiography (DSA) techniques for the evaluation of breast lesions", MEDICAL IMAGING AND INSTRUMENTATION '84. PRACTICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONVENTIONAL AND NEW IMAGING TECHNOLOGIES, LAS VEGAS, NV, USA, 8-10 APRIL 1984, ISSN 0277-786X, PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, 1984, USA, vol. 486, pages 129 - 133, XP002069177 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * page 131 - page 133 * | [X] - BARSUKOV V P ET AL, "X-RAY MONOCHROMATOR FOR DIGITAL SUBTRACTION ANGIOGRAPHY USING SYNCHROTRON RADIATION", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH, SECTION - A: ACCELERATORS, SPECTROMETERS, DETECTORS AND ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, (19911010), vol. A308, no. 1 / 02, pages 419 - 422, XP000265794 [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0168-9002(91)90684-I | [X] - MCCOLLOUGH C H ET AL, "A CORRELATED NOISE REDUCTION ALGORITHM FOR DUAL-ENERGY DIGITAL SUBTRACTION ANGIOGRAPHY", MEDICAL PHYSICS, (19891101), vol. 16, no. 6, pages 873 - 880, XP000085625 [X] 1-6 * paragraph [00IV] * * paragraph [00VI] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1118/1.596436 | [X] - DIGALAKIS V V ET AL, "A NEW THREE-DIMENSIONAL LINEAR PREDICTIVE ALGORITHM FOR DIGITAL SUBSTRACTION ANGIOGRAPHY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL NORTHEAST BIOENGINEERING CONFERENCE, BOSTON, MAR. 27 - 28, 1989, BUUS S, (19890327), no. CONF. 15, page 117/118, XP000041666 [X] 1-6 * siehe Absatz 3-D LS LINEAR PREDICTION * |