EP0994885 - NEW METALLOCENE COMPOUNDS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOREALIS A/S Lyngby Hovedgade 96 2800 Lyngby / DK | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REPO, Timo Oikokatu 6-8 T 30 FIN-00170 Helsinki / FI | 02 /
LESKELÄ, Markku Rauduntie 19 D FIN-02130 Espoo / FI | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Träskman, Berndt Hilding Berggren Oy Ab Kirkkokatu 9 90100 Oulu / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Träskman, Berndt Hilding Berggren Oy Ab, P.O. Box 16 00101 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 98933673.0 | 09.07.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998FI00581 | Priority number, date | FI19970002946 | 11.07.1997 Original published format: FI 972946 | [2000/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9902540 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0994885 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 21.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07F17/00, C08F4/642, C08F110/00 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F110/00 (EP,US);
C08F110/02 (EP,US);
C08F110/06 (EP,US);
C08F4/65912 (EP,US);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F110/00, C08F4/65922 (EP,US);
C08F110/02, C08F2500/03 (US,EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/09 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/17] | Title | German: | METALLOCENDERIVATE ZUR POLYMERISATION VON ETHYLENISCH UNGESÄTTIGTEN MONOMEREN | [2000/17] | English: | NEW METALLOCENE COMPOUNDS FOR THE POLYMERIZATION OF ETHYLENICALLY UNSATURATED MONOMERS | [2000/17] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSES DE METALLOCENES SERVANT A EFFECTUER LA POLYMERISATION DE MONOMERES ETHYLENIQUEMENT INSATURES | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 11.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/17] | 11.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/38] | 15.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0549900 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [X]EP0672675 (PHILLIPS PETROLEUM CO [US]); | [A]EP0754698 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND [JP]) | [X] - POLYMER BULLETIN, Volume 35, 1995, BERNHARD RIEGER et al., "Ethylene-Bridged Ansa-Zirconocene Dichlorides for Syndiospecific Propene Polymerization", pages 87-94. |