EP1006323 - RECEIVER TANK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.2004 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zexel Valeo Climate Control Corporation 39 Aza-Higashihara, Oaza Sendai, Kohnan-machi Ohsato-gun, Saitama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states Zexel Valeo Climate Control Corporation 39 Aza-Higashihara, Oaza Sendai, Kohnan-machi, Ohsato-gun Saitama / JP | ||
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states Zexel Corporation 6-7, Shibuya 3-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 150-0002 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Soichi, Zexel Corporation Kohnan Plant 39, Aza-Higashihara, Oaza-Sendai, Kohnan-machi Osato-gun, Saitama 360-0100 / JP | 02 /
TAKANO, Akihiko, Zexel Corporation Kohnan Plant 39, Aza-Higashihara, Oaza-Sendai, Kohnan-machi Osato-gun, Saitama 360-0100 / JP | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98933946.0 | 27.07.1998 | [2000/23] | WO1998JP03338 | Priority number, date | JP19970201504 | 28.07.1997 Original published format: JP 20150497 | JP19980108115 | 17.04.1998 Original published format: JP 10811598 | [2000/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905464 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1006323 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1006323 | Date: | 24.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F25B43/00, F28F9/26, F25B39/04 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
F25B39/04 (EP,US);
F25B2339/044 (EP,US);
F25B2339/0441 (EP,US);
F25B2500/01 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/23] | F25B43/00, F28F9/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/23] | Title | German: | SAMMELBEHÄLTER | [2000/23] | English: | RECEIVER TANK | [2000/23] | French: | RESERVOIR RECEPTEUR | [2000/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2000 | Translation filed | 28.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]DE19748662 (ZEXEL CORP [JP]) [PA] 1 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 6 *; | [A]EP0669506 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0689014 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 24 - column 4, line 29 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5159821 (NAKAMURA MIKI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * claims 1-5 * * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH09170854 (CALSONIC CORP); | [Y]JPH036262U ; | [Y]JPH05306857 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]JPH0338605Y ; | [A]JPH0258667U | by applicant | JPH02267478 | JPH04320771 | JPH0546511 |