EP1000446 - COAXIAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2004/19] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 16483 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET LM ERICSSON 126 25 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARWIDI, Viktoria Hedinsgatan 11 S-115 33 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
BLOMBERG, Ingela Skråpgränd 14 S-194 68 Upplands Väsby / SE | 03 /
FORSLUND, Anders Forsbrogatan 15 S-931 42 Skellefteå / SE | 04 /
SJÖDIN, Tore Egnahemsgatan 48 S-931 70 Skellefteå / SE | [2006/03] |
Former [2000/20] | 01 /
ARWIDI, Viktoria Hedinsgatan 11 S-115 33 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
BLOMBERG, Ingela Skr pgränd 14 S-194 68 Upplands Väsby / SE | |||
03 /
FORSLUND, Anders Forsbrogatan 15 S-931 42 Skellefte / SE | |||
04 /
SJÖDIN, Tore Egnahemsgatan 48 S-931 70 Skellefte / SE | Representative(s) | Cederbom, Hans Erik August Cegumark AB Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Cederbom, Hans Erik August Cegumark AB, Box 53047 400 14 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98934036.9 | 06.07.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998SE01322 | Priority number, date | SE19970002838 | 31.07.1997 Original published format: SE 9702838 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907040 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000446 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000446 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/646, H01R24/04 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
H01R13/745 (EP,US);
H01R24/547 (EP,US);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US);
Y10S439/944 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | H01R17/12, H01R21/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2006/21] |
Former [2000/20] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | KOAXIALVERBINDER | [2000/20] | English: | COAXIAL CONNECTOR | [2000/20] | French: | CONNECTEUR COAXIAL | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 07.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 09.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.05.2006 | BE | 24.05.2006 | CH | 24.05.2006 | IT | 24.05.2006 | LI | 24.05.2006 | NL | 24.05.2006 | DK | 24.08.2006 | SE | 24.08.2006 | ES | 04.09.2006 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
BE | 24.05.2006 | ||
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
NL | 24.05.2006 | ||
DK | 24.08.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
CH | 24.05.2006 | ||
LI | 24.05.2006 | ||
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/02] | AT | 24.05.2006 | |
SE | 24.08.2006 | ||
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/50] | SE | 24.08.2006 | |
ES | 04.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 24.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0380210 (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US]); | [A]EP0459664 (AMP INC [US]); | [A]EP0485245 (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US]); | [A]US5214673 (MORGENSTERN TODD A [US], et al); | [A]US5348491 (LOUWAGIE DOMINIC J [US], et al); | [A]US5413494 (DEWEY JAMES D [US], et al) |