EP0996542 - BARRIER MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astra Tech AB Aminogatan 1 431 21 Mölndal / SE | [2002/45] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | ||
Former [2000/18] | For all designated states Astra Aktiebolag 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETTERSSON, Agneta Astra Tech AB, P.O. Box 14 S-431 21 Mölndal / SE | 02 /
UTAS, Jan Astra Tech AB, P.O. Box 14 S-431 21 Mölndal / SE | [2004/49] |
Former [2000/18] | 01 /
PETTERSSON, Agneta Astra Tech AB, P.O. Box 14 S-431 21 Mölndal / SE | ||
02 /
UTA, Jan Astra Tech AB, P.O. Box 14 S-431 21 Mölndal / SE | Representative(s) | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/18] | Lindberg, Klas Valter Bo, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 11394 404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 98934097.1 | 13.07.1998 | [2000/18] | WO1998SE01383 | Priority number, date | SE19970002748 | 18.07.1997 Original published format: SE 9702748 | [2000/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9903677 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0996542 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0996542 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 28.01.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/06, B32B33/00, A61M25/00, B65B55/18 | [2000/18] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/06 (KR);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B27/34 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B65B55/02 (EP,US);
B65B55/18 (EP,US);
B32B2307/7242 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [2000/18] | Title | German: | SPERRMATERIAL | [2000/18] | English: | BARRIER MATERIAL | [2000/18] | French: | MATIERE BARRIERE | [2000/18] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 14.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 26.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.12.2004 | BE | 08.12.2004 | CH | 08.12.2004 | FI | 08.12.2004 | FR | 08.12.2004 | IT | 08.12.2004 | LI | 08.12.2004 | NL | 08.12.2004 | DK | 08.03.2005 | GR | 08.03.2005 | SE | 08.03.2005 | DE | 09.03.2005 | ES | 19.03.2005 | PT | 08.05.2005 | GB | 13.07.2005 | IE | 13.07.2005 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
FR | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
SE | 08.03.2005 | ||
DE | 09.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/35] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
FR | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
DE | 09.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
GB | 13.07.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
FR | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
DE | 09.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/25] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
DE | 09.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
IE | 13.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
NL | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
DE | 09.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
DK | 08.03.2005 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
ES | 19.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
BE | 08.12.2004 | ||
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 08.12.2004 | |
CH | 08.12.2004 | ||
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
GR | 08.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 08.12.2004 | |
FI | 08.12.2004 | ||
LI | 08.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 08.12.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP05084276 ; | [X]US3442686 (JONES JOHN WILLARD); | [Y]US3967728 (GORDON ROBERT L, et al); | [X]EP0550039 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]); | [AP]WO9726937 (ASTRA AB [SE], et al) | [X] - FILE WPI, Derwent Accession No. 93-148519, OIKE KOGYO KK., "Package for Transfusing Liq. Vessel-Includes Filled Vessel and Film Package Prepd. by Laminating Unstretched Polypropylene Inner Layer and PET Outer Layer"; & JP,A,05 084 276 (06-04-93) DW9318., & JP05084276 A 00000000 |