EP0993560 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPERATING A CLUTCH IN AN AUTOMATED MECHANICAL TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2004 | Change - withdrawal | published on 24.11.2004 [2004/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Transmission Technologies Corporation 23382 Commerce Drive Farmington Hills, MI 48335 / US | [2000/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WHEELER, James, A. 2343 Coe Court Perrysburg, OH 43551 / US | [2000/16] | Representative(s) | Giles, Ashley Simon, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/16] | Giles, Ashley Simon, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 98934391.8 | 09.07.1998 | [2000/16] | WO1998US14312 | Priority number, date | US19970891625 | 09.07.1997 Original published format: US 891625 | [2000/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9902876 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0993560 | Date: | 19.04.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16D48/06 | [2004/41] | CPC: |
F16D48/066 (EP,US);
B60W30/18027 (EP);
B60W2050/0045 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0241 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0638 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0657 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1005 (EP,US);
B60W2510/104 (EP,US);
B60W2710/023 (EP,US);
F16D2500/5048 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/16] | F16D1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/16] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETÄTIGEN EINER KUPPLUNG IN EINEM AUTOMATISIERTEN MECHANISCHEN GETRIEBE | [2000/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OPERATING A CLUTCH IN AN AUTOMATED MECHANICAL TRANSMISSION | [2000/16] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ACTIONNER L'EMBRAYAGE DANS UNE TRANSMISSION MECANIQUE AUTOMATISEE | [2000/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2000 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/16] | 20.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/46] | 23.09.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2004 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0328299 (EATON CORP [US]) [Y] 1-7 * column 5, line 15 - line 25; claim 1 *; | [Y]US5056639 (PETZOLD RAINER [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7 * column 5; figure -; claims 1,3 *; | [A]EP0709246 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1* column 7, line 1 - line 5; claim 3 * | International search | [X]US4295551 (ZIMMERMANN FRANK, et al); | [X]US4722429 (KONO HIROMI [JP]); | [X]US5086894 (IIZUKA NANORI [JP], et al) |