EP1000223 - HIGH EFFICIENCY ROTARY VANE MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420-3630 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states THERMO KING CORPORATION 314 West 90th Street Minneapolis Minnesota 55420-3630 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VIEGAS, Herman, H. 7710 West 87th Street Bloomington, MN 55438 / US | 02 /
McCLELLAN, Bruce, E. 6439 16th Avenue Richfield, MN 55423 / US | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Harland, Linda Jane, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Harland, Linda Jane, et al c/o Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 98934417.1 | 10.07.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998US14360 | Priority number, date | US19970057011 | 11.07.1997 Original published format: US 57011 | [2000/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9902862 | Date: | 21.01.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1000223 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F01C1/344, F01C21/08, F04C18/344 | [2002/20] | CPC: |
F01C1/3442 (EP,US);
F01C21/0809 (EP,US);
F01C21/0863 (EP,US);
F05C2225/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/20] | F01C1/344 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/48] |
Former [2000/20] | DE, FR, GR, IT | Title | German: | DREHFLÜGELZELLENMOTOR MIT HOHEM WIRKUNGSGRAD | [2000/20] | English: | HIGH EFFICIENCY ROTARY VANE MOTOR | [2000/20] | French: | MOTEUR A AILETTES ROTATIVES A RENDEMENT ELEVE | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2000 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 08.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/17] | 22.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3865520 (KRAMER LEO, et al) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 7 - column 3, line 45; figure 2 * [Y] 7-10; | [XY]DE2544232 (GEN ELECTRIC) [X] 1-3,6,7 * page 3, line 9 - page 4, line 12; figure 1 * [Y] 4,5; | [X]US3238848 (BENT JOHN H) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column 2, line 31 - column 2, line 72; figures 1,4 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 15 *; | [Y]US4636153 (ISHIZUKA YUTAKA [JP], et al) [Y] 4,5 * column 3, line 54 - column 6, line 6; figure 2 *; | [Y]JPS6022086 ; | [A]US2622538 (GUSTAVE VINCENT HENRI CHARLES) [A] 7-10 * column 1, line 37 - column 1, line 45; figure 3 * * column 2, line 18 - column 2, line 54 * * column 3, line 6 - column 3, line 10 * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850618), vol. 009, no. 142, Database accession no. (M - 388), & JP60022086 A 19850204 (NIPPON PISTON RING KK) [Y] 7-10 * abstract * | International search | [X]US2159232 (SHAFF ERNEST H); | [X]US2980078 (CONOVER JR ERNEST R); | [X]US3901631 (WICKHAM JOHN LUPTON, et al); | [X]JPS5862302 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPS6022086 (NIPPON PISTON RING CO LTD) |