EP1005724 - POST-COMPRESSION HIDDEN DATA TRANSPORT FOR VIDEO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2013 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 20.12.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.01.2014 [2014/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verance Corporation 4435 Eastgate Mall, Suite 350 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2008/17] |
Former [2001/48] | For all designated states Verance Corporation 10145 Pacific Heights Blvd Suite 200 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | ||
Former [2000/23] | For all designated states Solana Technology Development Corporation 6256 Greenwich Drive, Suite 500 San Diego, California 92122 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Chong, U. 11710 Alderidge Lane San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 02 /
MOALLEMI, Kamran 4314 Vista De La Tierra Del Mar, CA 92014-4101 / US | 03 /
HINDERLING, Jurg 4655 Serenata Place San Diego, CA 92130-2462 / US | [2000/23] | Representative(s) | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/23] | McCarthy, Denis Alexis, et al MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 98934669.7 | 22.07.1998 | [2000/23] | WO1998US15111 | Priority number, date | US19970912434 | 18.08.1997 Original published format: US 912434 | [2000/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909684 | Date: | 25.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1005724 | Date: | 07.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.02.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04B14/06, H04B1/66, G06T1/00 | [2005/49] | CPC: |
G06T1/0028 (EP,US);
H04N5/913 (KR);
G10L19/018 (EP,US);
H04B1/665 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23892 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N5/917 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2000/23] | H04B14/06, H04B1/66 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/23] | Title | German: | ÜBERTRAGUNG VON VERSTECKTEN DATEN NACH DER KOMPRESSION FÜR VIDEOSIGNALE | [2000/23] | English: | POST-COMPRESSION HIDDEN DATA TRANSPORT FOR VIDEO | [2000/23] | French: | TRANSPORT DE DONNEES MASQUEES APRES LA COMPRESSION DANS UN SIGNAL VIDEO | [2000/23] | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.02.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/04] | 19.12.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.02.2014 | 19.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9721293 (SOLANA TECHNOLOGY DEV CORP [US]) [A] 1-41* abstract *; | [X] - HARTUNG F ET AL, "Digital watermarking of MPEG-2 coded video in the bitstream domain", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICASSP-97., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 21-24 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), vol. 4, ISBN 0-8186-7919-0, pages 2621 - 2624, XP010225693 [X] 1 * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.595326 | [X] - SILVESTRE G C M ET AL, "Image watermarking using digital communication techniques", IMAGE PROCESSING AND ITS APPLICATIONS, 1997., SIXTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DUBLIN, IRELAND 14-17 JULY 1997, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, (19970714), vol. 1, ISBN 0-85296-692-X, pages 443 - 447, XP006508331 [X] 1 * section 3.1, 3.2 * | [A] - TIRKEL A Z ET AL, "Image watermarking-a spread spectrum application", SPREAD SPECTRUM TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS PROCEEDINGS, 1996., IEEE 4TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON MAINZ, GERMANY 22-25 SEPT. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19960922), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-3567-8, pages 785 - 789, XP010208692 [A] 1-41 * section 2, 4.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSSTA.1996.563231 | [A] - SWANSON M D ET AL, "Transparent robust image watermarking", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP) LAUSANNE, SEPT. 16 - 19, 1996, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19960916), VOL. 1, ISBN 0-7803-3259-8, pages 211 - 214, XP010202368 [A] 1-41 * figure 1 * * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1996.560421 | International search | [A]US5161210 (DRUYVESTEYN WILLEM F [NL], et al); | [A]US5479299 (MATSUMI CHIYOKO [JP], et al); | [A]US5490170 (AKAGIRI KENZO [JP], et al); | [A]US5588022 (DAPPER MARK J [US], et al); | [A]US5598228 (SAITOH MITSUMASA [JP]) |