EP0986918 - METHOD AND DATA PROCESSING INSTALLATION ENABLING SWITCHING IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÖBIG, Norbert Im Erlich 79 D-64291 Darmstadt / DE | [2000/12] | Application number, filing date | 98934843.8 | 02.06.1998 | [2000/12] | WO1998DE01493 | Priority number, date | DE1997123091 | 02.06.1997 Original published format: DE 19723091 | [2000/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9856189 | Date: | 10.12.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0986918 | Date: | 22.03.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.1998 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00, H04Q3/62 | [2000/12] | CPC: |
H04M3/42 (EP);
H04Q2213/13031 (EP);
H04Q2213/13034 (EP);
H04Q2213/1307 (EP);
H04Q2213/13097 (EP);
H04Q2213/13102 (EP);
H04Q2213/13106 (EP);
H04Q2213/1313 (EP);
H04Q2213/13138 (EP);
H04Q2213/13141 (EP);
H04Q2213/13176 (EP);
H04Q2213/13209 (EP);
H04Q2213/13217 (EP);
H04Q2213/1322 (EP);
H04Q2213/13292 (EP);
H04Q2213/13345 (EP);
H04Q2213/1338 (EP);
H04Q2213/13383 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT [2000/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND DATENVERARBEITUNGSANLAGE ZUM VERMITTELN IN EINEM TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2000/12] | English: | METHOD AND DATA PROCESSING INSTALLATION ENABLING SWITCHING IN A TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM | [2000/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES POUR COMMUTATION DANS UN SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATION | [2000/12] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.1999 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.1998 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.1999 | Examination requested [2000/12] | 03.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/25] | 03.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0200353 (STC, PLC) [A] 1,3,7-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB2300089 (EUROTEL TELECOM, LIMITED) [A] 1,5-8,10 * abstract * * page 2, line 25 - page 3, line 17 * * figure 4; claims 1-3 *; | [A]EP0667723 (SIEMENS ALBIS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1,2,4,8 * page 4, line 8 - page 5, line 3 * |